Stewart-Patterson v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Stewart-Patterson
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv20902
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 7/20/2012. (sry)
November 19, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 40 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; granting in part and denying in part 41 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/19/2012. (sry)
November 30, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/30/2012. (sry)
December 6, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part, deferring in part, and denying in part 68 Plaintiff's Motions in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 71 Defendant's Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 72 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/6/2012. (sry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart-Patterson v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Stewart-Patterson
Represented By: Glen Z. Goldberg
Represented By: Judd Gordon Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Randy Scott Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.