U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Rubio et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Jose S Rubio and Rubio Wealth Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv22129
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Robin S. Rosenbaum
Presiding Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER STRIKING 26 Defendant Rubio's Email from the record for failure to comply with the Court's Orders; ORDER for Rubio to properly file his pro se notice and opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment no later than 10/23/2012. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/16/2012. (bon)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Requiring Corporate Defendant to Obtain Counsel; ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Please see Order for details. Notice of appearance by counsel for corporate Defendant due 10/12/2012; Notice of appearance by counsel or pro se notice for individual Defendant due 10/12/2012. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 9/25/2012. (bon)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service of Process by Electronic Mail. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 8/21/2012. (bon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Rubio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: David W. Oakland
Represented By: Nathan B. Ploener
Represented By: Manal M. Sultan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose S Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubio Wealth Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?