Rosenberg v. DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maury Rosenberg
Defendant: DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC, DVI Receivables, XVI, LLC, DVI Receivables, XVII, LLC, DVI Receivables, XVIII, LLC, DVI Receivables, XIX, LLC, DVI Funding, LLC, Ashland Funding, LLC, Jane Fox, LYON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., Robert Pinel, FLAMM BOROFF & BACINE, PC, Robert Brier, BG MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2012cv22275
Filed: June 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Seitz
Presiding Judge: Andrea M. Simonton
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER denying 318 Motion for Relief From Judgment as to Punitive Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(6). Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 7/31/2017. (vmz)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER denying 310 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal and Pending Ruling on Motion for Mutual Judgment Satisfaction. Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 5/15/2017. (ls)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER denying 299 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 50(b) Motion; denying 300 Motion to Treat Rule 50(a) Motion as Timely Rule 50(b) Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 5/5/2017. (ls)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 VACATED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 260 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/29/2014. (ps1) Modified text per 273 Order on 9/29/2014 (yha).
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request to Exclude Evidence of Loss Life Insurance Value re 46 Memorandum, filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., DVI Funding, LLC, Jane Fox, DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC, DVI Receivables, XVI, LLC, DVI Receivables, XIX, LLC, DVI Receivables, XVII, LLC, Lyon Financial Services, Inc., DVI Receivables, XVIII, LLC Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 10/26/2012. (ail)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON DAMAGES RECOVERABLE UNDER 11 USC 303(i)(2). (1) Defendants' motion to preclude Plaintiff from recovering damages on behalf of third parties is GRANTED. (2) The Court RESERVES RULING on Defendants' request to preclude evidence of P laintiffs emotional damages until after Plaintiff has been deposed on this issue. The deposition must take place on or before November 9, 2012. (3) Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Reputation Damages is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff may present evidence of damage to his own reputation, but evidence of damage to the reputations of the third party entities is precluded. (4) The Court RESERVES RULING on Defendants' motion to exclude evidence of l ifeinsurance value until after Defendants file the entirety of the Newman deposition transcript and Plaintiff provides any evidence showing that he paid the premiums on the insurance polices. The parties shall file the supplemental information no later than October 23, 2012 af 5 pm. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 10/19/2012. (wc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenberg v. DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maury Rosenberg
Represented By: Carlos E. Sardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables, XVI, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables, XVII, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables, XVIII, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables, XIX, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Funding, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Fox
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Pinel
Represented By: Andrew James Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAMM BOROFF & BACINE, PC
Represented By: Andrew James Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brier
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BG MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?