Rosenberg et al v. DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sara Rosenberg, 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP and 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP
Defendant: Lyon Financial Services, Inc., DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC, DVI Funding, LLC, DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC, DVI Receivables XVIII, LLC, Jane Fox, U.S. Bank, N.A., DVI Receivables XIX, LLC and DVI Receivables XVI, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv23004
Filed: August 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2014 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:13-cv-23004 electronically transferred out to Pennsylvania Eastern. (cbr)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Dismiss for insufficient process and service of process and for improper venue. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/26/2014. (cbr)
September 24, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION for Scheduling Conference by 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, Sara Rosenberg. (Byrd, Tucker)
July 15, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE by Sara Rosenberg Charging Lien. Attorney Damien Hunter Prosser added to party Sara Rosenberg(pty:pla). (Prosser, Damien)
April 4, 2014 Filing 16 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2013-63 to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff no longer assigned to case. (dm)
December 10, 2013 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Notice (Other),,,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 13 and 14 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cbr)
December 9, 2013 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline DVI Funding, LLC served on 9/23/2013, answer due 10/15/2013; DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC served on 10/17/2013, answer due 11/7/2013; DVI Receivables XIX, LLC served on 11/18/2013, answer due 12/9/2013; DVI Receivables XVI, LLC served on 11/18/2013, answer due 12/9/2013; DVI Receivables XVIII, LLC served on 11/18/2013, answer due 12/9/2013; DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013; U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 9/25/2013, answer due 10/16/2013. see DE #12 for image (cbr)
December 9, 2013 Filing 13 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted as to Jane Fox. see DE #12 for image (cbr)
December 9, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE by 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, Sara Rosenberg, 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES, XIV, LLC, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES XVI, LLC, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES XVIII, LLC, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES XIX, LLC, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI FUNDING, LLC, #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on JANE FOX, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on U.S. BANK, N.A.)(Byrd, Tucker)
December 9, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Striking #10 Notice (Other),,, filed by 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP, 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP, 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP, 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, Sara Rosenberg, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP by 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, Sara Rosenberg, 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP, 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP (Byrd, Tucker)
December 9, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE by 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, Sara Rosenberg, 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES, XIV, LLC, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES XVI, LLC, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES XVIII, LLC, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI RECEIVABLES XIX, LLC, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on DVI FUNDING, LLC, #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on JANE FOX, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on U.S. BANK, N.A.)(Byrd, Tucker)
November 18, 2013 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue and Insufficient Process and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by DVI Funding, LLC, DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC, DVI Receivables XIX, LLC, DVI Receivables XVI, LLC, DVI Receivables XVIII, LLC, DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC, Jane Fox, Lyon Financial Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Levitt, Peter)
November 7, 2013 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue and Insufficient Process and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP, 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP, 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP, 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, Sara Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Byrd, Tucker)
October 25, 2013 Filing 7 Notice of Pendency of Other Action by U.S. Bank, N.A. (Levitt, Peter)
October 21, 2013 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue and Insufficient Process and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by DVI Funding, LLC, DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC, DVI Receivables XIX, LLC, DVI Receivables XVI, LLC, DVI Receivables XVIII, LLC, DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC, Jane Fox, Lyon Financial Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/7/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Levitt, Peter)
October 15, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, and for Improper Venue and Insufficient Service of Process by DVI Funding, LLC, DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC, DVI Receivables XIX, LLC, DVI Receivables XVI, LLC, DVI Receivables XVIII, LLC, DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC, Jane Fox, Lyon Financial Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party DVI Funding, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party DVI Receivables XIX, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party DVI Receivables XVI, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party DVI Receivables XVIII, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party Jane Fox(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party Lyon Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Harlan Levitt added to party U.S. Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/1/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Levitt, Peter)
September 20, 2013 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cbr)
September 19, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP, 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP, 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP, 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, Sara Rosenberg (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summonses)(Byrd, Tucker)
August 20, 2013 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (yha)
August 20, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-5990308, filed by 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP, Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP, Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust, Sara Rosenberg, 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP, Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP, Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP, 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP, Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP, 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byrd, Tucker)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenberg et al v. DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Rosenberg
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Represented By: Damien Hunter Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1501 Edgemont Associates, LP
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imaging Properties of Philadelphia, LP
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imaging Properties of Illinois, LP
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Limited Partnership IV, LP
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Rosenberg 2004 Trust
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 209 Chestnut St. Assoc., LP
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imaging Properties of Roxborough, LP
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1538 Dekalb Associates, LP
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1561 Medical Drive Associates, LP
Represented By: Tucker Harrison Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyon Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI RECEIVABLES XVII, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Funding, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables, XIV, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables XVIII, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Fox
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables XIX, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI Receivables XVI, LLC
Represented By: Peter Harlan Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?