Mason v. CITY OF MIAMI GARDENS, FLORIDA
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Mason
Defendant: CITY OF MIAMI GARDENS, FLORIDA
Case Number: 1:2014cv23908
Filed: October 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Seitz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Affirming 70 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 1/24/2017. (cqs)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are denied as moot. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/1/2016. (wc) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part 21 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2015.). Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 5/6/2015. (cqs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. CITY OF MIAMI GARDENS, FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Mason
Represented By: Alex J. Pearlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF MIAMI GARDENS, FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?