JPAY, INC. v. Kobel et al
Plaintiff: JPAY, INC.
Defendant: Cynthia Kobel and Shalanda Houston
Case Number: 1:2016cv20121
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Darrin P. Gayles
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 54 JPay's Application to Partially Vacate Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying in part 11 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 5/16/2016. (hs01)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPAY, INC. v. Kobel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPAY, INC.
Represented By: Steven Wayne Davis
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Heller
Represented By: Stephen N. Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Kobel
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalanda Houston
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?