Movimiento Democracia, Inc. et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Movimiento Democracia, Inc., Liban Concepcion Lio, Alexeis Leyva, Michael Perez Perez, Yordanki Perez Varea, Alexander Vergara Perez and Jegnier Almaguer Cespedes
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of State, U.S. Department of State, United States Attorney General and Director, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2016cv21868
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Darrin P. Gayles
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 33 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 35 Plaintiffs' Motion. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/8/2016. (ahk)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying request for discovery. Motions for summary judgment due 8/1/2016. Responses due 8/15/2016. Replies due 8/22/2016. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 7/1/2016. (ahk)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 6/28/2016. (ahk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Movimiento Democracia, Inc. et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Movimiento Democracia, Inc.
Represented By: Santiago A. Alpizar
Represented By: Kendall Brindley Coffey
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Luis Fernandez
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Virlenys Palma
Represented By: William J. Sanchez-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liban Concepcion Lio
Represented By: Santiago A. Alpizar
Represented By: Kendall Brindley Coffey
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Luis Fernandez
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Virlenys Palma
Represented By: William J. Sanchez-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexeis Leyva
Represented By: Santiago A. Alpizar
Represented By: Kendall Brindley Coffey
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Luis Fernandez
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Virlenys Palma
Represented By: William J. Sanchez-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Perez Perez
Represented By: Santiago A. Alpizar
Represented By: Kendall Brindley Coffey
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Luis Fernandez
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Virlenys Palma
Represented By: William J. Sanchez-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yordanki Perez Varea
Represented By: Santiago A. Alpizar
Represented By: Kendall Brindley Coffey
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Luis Fernandez
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Virlenys Palma
Represented By: William J. Sanchez-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Vergara Perez
Represented By: Santiago A. Alpizar
Represented By: Kendall Brindley Coffey
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Luis Fernandez
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Virlenys Palma
Represented By: William J. Sanchez-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jegnier Almaguer Cespedes
Represented By: Santiago A. Alpizar
Represented By: Kendall Brindley Coffey
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Luis Fernandez
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Virlenys Palma
Represented By: William J. Sanchez-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State, U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?