Gil v. Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Gil
Defendant: Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv23020
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Referring Judge: Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Scola
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION, VERDICT AND ORDER Following Non-Jury Trial Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/12/2017. (yha) Modified to convert to Opinion on 6/13/2017 (yha).
May 31, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part the 52 Defendant's Motion to Strike. The Plaintiff shall show cause why the Court should not award the Defendant attorneys' fees on or before 12:00 p.m. on June 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/31/2017. (jle)
April 11, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Plaintiff's MOTION Deem Admissions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/7/2017. (ail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gil v. Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Gil
Represented By: Scott Richard Dinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Virginia Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?