Markivia Beaubrun v. Geico General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Markiva Beaubrun
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv24205
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Marcia G. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edwin G. Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/28/2018. (tm)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 49 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/1/2017. (js02)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 41 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/17/2017. (js02)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/4/2017. (js02)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS denying 5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/17/2016. (tm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markivia Beaubrun v. Geico General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markiva Beaubrun
Represented By: Christopher J. Lynch
Represented By: Stuart Hendler Share
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam Alexander-Speer Duke
Represented By: Michel Alexis Morgan
Represented By: Derek Lorenz Veliz
Represented By: B. Richard Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?