Quevedo et al v. Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana Sociedad Anonima Operadora Co.
Plaintiff: Fanny Quevedo and Carlos Quevedo
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana Sociedad Anonima Operadora Co.
Case Number: 1:2017cv21168
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Edwin G. Torres
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Scola
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying 174 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 174 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. See attached document for full details. (zlz)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Adopting 185 Report and Recommendations Re: 175 Plaintiff's MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Carlos Quevedo, Fanny Quevedo. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (abu)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER on Motions for Summary Judgment 50 52 . Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. See attached document for full details. (zlz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quevedo et al v. Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana Sociedad Anonima Operadora Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fanny Quevedo
Represented By: Alaina R Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Represented By: Michael Scott Olin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Quevedo
Represented By: Alaina R Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Represented By: Michael Scott Olin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana Sociedad Anonima Operadora Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?