Adria MM Productions, Ltd. v. Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adria MM Productions, Ltd.
Defendant: Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Adria MM Productions, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2017cv21603
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Federico A. Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Denying 203 Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and 203 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying 62 69 the Parties' Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (koa)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.'s Second Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/2/2018. (koa)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Reaffirming Prohibition on Deposing Sandra York. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/30/2017. (kcg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adria MM Productions, Ltd. v. Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adria MM Productions, Ltd.
Represented By: Vincent Frank Alexander
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Yano L. Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Marc Landy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Marc Landy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Adria MM Productions, Ltd.
Represented By: Vincent Frank Alexander
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Yano L. Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?