TIKD Services LLC v. The Florida Bar et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: TIKD Services LLC
Defendant: Mark S. Gold, The Florida Bar, Michael J. Higer, Jeffery R. Lotter, John F Harkness, Robert R. Willhoit, Lori S. Holcomb, Robert Azcano, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, Ted L. Hollander, Gold And Associates, P.A., Michelle Suskauer and Joshua Doyle
Case Number: 1:2017cv24103
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #260 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The Bar Defendants' deadline for filing any motion for attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs under Local Rule 7.3 is extended another 30 days to May 6, 2019. Plaintiff's deadline to file any objections to the Report and Recommendations on Motion to Tax Costs is extended until the same time that a response would be due to any motion filed by the Bar Defendants pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/27/2019. (JG)
March 27, 2019 Filing 260 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Bar Defendants to File Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs re #255 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #253 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar by Joshua Doyle, The Florida Bar. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #258 Motion for Extension of Time. The Bar Defendants' deadline for filing any motion for attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs under Local Rule 7.3 is extended another 30 days to April 5, 2019. Plaintiff's deadline to file any objections to the #255 Report and Recommendations on Motion to Tax Costs is extended until the same time that a response would be due to any motion filed by the Bar Defendants pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/27/2019. (jdo)
February 27, 2019 Filing 258 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Further Extend Deadline for Bar Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs re #256 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines for Bar Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs, and for Plaintiff's Objection to Report and Recommendations on Motion to Tax Costs re #255 REPORT AN by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. Responses due by 3/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #256 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The Bar Defendants' deadline for filing any motion for attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs under Local Rule 7.3 is extended 30 days to March 6, 2019. Plaintiff's deadline to file any objections to the #255 Report and Recommendations on Motion to Tax Costs is extended until the same time that a response would be due to any motion filed by the Bar Defendants pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/31/2019. (jdo)
January 31, 2019 Filing 256 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines for Bar Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs, and for Plaintiff's Objection to Report and Recommendations on Motion to Tax Costs re #255 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #253 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. Responses due by 2/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Filing 255 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on #253 Motion to Tax Costs. Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jdo)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 PAPERLESS ORDER referring #253 MOTION for Bill of Costs. Defendants' Motion is referred to the Honorable Jonathan Goodman pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/4/2019. (ecz)
January 3, 2019 Filing 253 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. Responses due by 1/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Memorandum in Support)(Cox, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 252 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #251 Notice of Appeal, filed by TIKD Services LLC. Date received by USCA: 12/28/2018. USCA Case Number: 18-15346-F. (apz)
December 28, 2018 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #251 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 28, 2018 Filing 251 Notice of Appeal as to #250 Order Dismissing Case by TIKD Services LLC. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-11272920. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Kuntz, Robert)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
December 3, 2018 Filing 249 NOTICE by Guy A Rasco, Devine Goodman Rasco & Watts-FitzGerald, LLP of Attorneys' Charging Lien. Attorney Guy Austin Rasco added to party Guy A Rasco(pty:ip), Attorney Guy Austin Rasco added to party Devine Goodman Rasco & Watts-FitzGerald, LLP(pty:ip). (Rasco, Guy)
October 23, 2018 Filing 248 TRANSCRIPT of a motion to dismiss hearing held on 10/17/18 before Judge Marcia G. Cooke, 1-43 pages, Court Reporter: Diane Peede, 305-523-5048 / Diane_Peede@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2019. (dpe)
October 17, 2018 Filing 247 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2018 re #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, filed by Lori S. Holcomb, Michael J. Higer, John F Harkness, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Total time in court: 1 hour. Attorney Appearances: Kevin W Cox, Markenzy Lapointe, Jerome Wayne Hoffman, Robert J. Kuntz, Peter D. Kennedy. Court Reporter: Diane Peede, 305-523-5048 / Diane_Peede@flsd.uscourts.gov. (im)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #245 Joint Motion to Modify Deadlines for Joint Pretrial Stipulation and for Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Daubert Motions. The parties shall have until October 26, 2018 to file the Joint Pretrial Stipulation. Plaintiff shall have until October 26, 2018 to file its response to the Daubert motions. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/4/2018. (ecz)
October 3, 2018 Filing 245 Joint MOTION to Modify Deadlines for Joint Pretrial Stipulation and for Plaintiff's Response to Daubert Motions by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion to Modify Deadlines)(Kuntz, Robert)
September 28, 2018 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cox, Kevin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 243 MOTION To Exclude the Testimony of V. Walter Bratic and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 242 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Abrantes-Metz and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/28/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
September 27, 2018 Filing 240 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ticket Clinic Defendants with Prejudice by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit (McGuire, James)
September 25, 2018 Filing 239 NOTICE of Compliance by Anthony Eladio Ramos re #225 Order on Motion to Intervene (cqs)
September 21, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 238 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1598578)
September 20, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 237 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (745766)
September 20, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 236 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (745766)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #191 Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal. The following documents shall be filed under seal and maintained as such until the conclusion of any direct appeal in this matter, at which time they shall be returned to counsel for the Bar Defendants: (1) the full, unredacted version of the Bar Defendants' Motion for Summary Final Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law; (2) the full, unreacted version of the Bar Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Final Judgment; and (3) Exhibits J, K, and L to the Bar Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2018. (ecz)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #188 Unopposed Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The following documents shall be filed under seal and maintained as such until the conclusion of any direct appeal in this matter, at which time they shall be returned to Counsel for Defendants: 1. The Ticket Clinic Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; 2. The Ticket Clinic Defendants' Statement of Material Facts; 3. Portions of the June 21, 2018 deposition of Chris Riley and TFB Exhibit Nos. 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, and Gold Exhibit Nos. 1 and 2 to that deposition; 4. Portions of the June 28, 2018 30(b)(6) deposition of Chris Riley and Gold Exhibit 8and Hollander Exhibit 6 to that that deposition; 5. Portions of the deposition of Thomas Spahn; 6. Portions of the 30(b)(6) deposition of The Ticket Clinic; 7. Portions of the deposition of Ted Hollander; 8. Exhibit 9 to the deposition of Lilijean Quintilian; 9. The document Bates numbered TIKD000127; 10. The document Bates numbered TIKD002094; 11. Plaintiff's Interrogatory Answer # 10 to The Ticket Clinic's Interrogatories; 12. The document Bates numbered TIKD000042-000048; 13. The document Bates numbered TIKD000069-000076; 14. The document Bates numbered TIKD000127;15. The documents Bates numbered Abrantes-Metz000001-Abrantes-Metz000120; 16. The documents Bates numbered BRATIC000001-BRATIC000089. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2018. (ecz)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #201 Unopposed Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The following documents shall be filed under seal and maintained as such until the conclusion of any direct appeal in this matter, at which time they shall be returned to Counsel for Plaintiff: (1) the full, unredacted version of Plaintiff's Statement of Facts to be Tried and Response to Ticket Clinic Defendants' Statement of Facts; and (2) the full, unredacted version of Plaintiff's Statement of Facts to be Tried and Response to Florida Bar Defendants' Statement of Facts. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2018. (ecz)
September 20, 2018 Filing 232 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTIONS. Oral argument regarding #17 The Florida Bar Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #43 Defendant Ted L. Hollander's Motion to Dismiss, and #47 Defendant Gold and Associates, P.A., Robert Azcano, Jeffery R. Lotter, and Robert R. Whillhoit's Motion to Dismiss shall be heard on October 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. The Court defers ruling on the #101 Motion for Sanctions for Filing Frivolous Lawsuit Against Ramon Abadin, Esq., Sedgwick, LLP, David King, Esq., Peter Kennedy, Esq., and Graves, Dougherty, Hearon, and Moody, P.A. until after the October 17, 2018 hearing. If the Court determines that it would benefit from hearing oral arguments regarding that motion, it will scheduled them at a later date. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2018. (ecz) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (wc).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER denying #69 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Serve Process in Violation of Court's Process Order and #100 Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Serve Process in Violation of Court's Process Order, Alternatively, Motion to Quash Service of Process If In Fact It Has Been Effectuated. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 PAPERLESS ORDER re #216 Notice (Other) filed by TIKD Services LLC, 213 Discovery Hearing, #214 Order, #226 Notice (Other), filed by The Florida Bar, 229 Order,, Terminate Motions, #195 Notice (Other) filed by The Florida Bar, #228 Memorandum filed by TIKD Services LLC, 220 Order,,,, United States District Judge Marcia G. Cooke yesterday entered an Order granting a motion for stay of discovery. Given this development, the Undersigned will not now spend any additional time assessing the issue of whether the Florida Bar may in discovery withhold from production documents and electronically stored information concerning communications between Florida attorneys and Florida Bar staff attorneys staffing the Bar's Ethics Hot Line about TIKD.The parties shall within five days of the stay being lifted notify the Undersigned by written notice filed on CM/ECF that the stay is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/20/2018. (JG)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #94 Bar Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery Proceedings Pending Resolution of Their Motion to Dismiss. Discovery is STAYED pending resolution of the Bar Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 17). Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/19/2018. (ecz)
September 18, 2018 Filing 228 MEMORANDUM of Law re #214 Order TIKD's Memorandum of Law on Discoverability of Communications by TIKD Services LLC. (Kuntz, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Filing 227 RESPONSE to #212 Response/Reply (Other) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant The Florida State Bar's Objections to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts to be Tried by TIKD Services LLC. (Kuntz, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 226 NOTICE by The Florida Bar re #214 Order The Florida Bar's Memorandum of Law on Discoverability of Communications Between Bar Staff Attorneys and Bar Ethics Hotline Callers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Cox, Kevin)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER ON MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #106 The Ticket Clinic Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Have Their Motions to Dismiss Directed to the Initial Complaint Be Deemed Directed To and Timely Filed in Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/10/2018. (ecz)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #105 Unopposed Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/10/2018. (ecz)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #104 Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/10/2018. (ecz)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 PAPERLESS ORDER re #216 Notice (Other) filed by TIKD Services LLC, #214 Order This Order concerns the briefing the parties will be submitting about The Florida Bar's claim that documents reflecting which Florida attorneys contacted its ethics hotline and outlining the substance of those communications are privileged and cannot be disclosed to Plaintiff.In its memorandum of law, in addition to discussing other topics required by the Court, the Florida Bar shall discuss (1) whether the privilege it asserts is complete or limited or qualified or absolute and (2) how other state Supreme Courts have interpreted similar privilege positions taken by other state Bars.The Undersigned recognizes that the deadline for the Florida Bar's brief is tomorrow. Because the Undersigned is adding these new topics, the Florida Bar's brief will now be due on September 10, 2018 and TIKD's brief will be due on September 18, 2018.In addition, each side will have five (5) additional pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/5/2018. (JG)
September 4, 2018 Filing 221 Third supplement of Anthony Eladio Ramos, to rule 24 (b)(1)(B) MOTION to Intervene-Including Reply to Defendants' ( Gold and Associates, P.A., Ted Hollander, Jeffrey Lotter, Robert Azcano, and Robert Willhoit) Notice of Supplemental Authority in support of their Motions to Dismiss and rule 11 Motion for Sanctions by Anthony Eladio Ramos. (ebz) Modified text on 9/6/2018 (dm).
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ENDORSED ORDER canceling the September 7, 2018 discovery hearing in light of the #217 notice of cancellation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/4/2018. (jdo)
August 31, 2018 Filing 218 NOTICE by The Florida Bar of Withdrawal of Dominic C. MacKenzie as Counsel for the Florida Bar Defendants (Cox, Kevin)
August 31, 2018 Filing 217 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING by ATTORNEY: re #182 NOTICE by Gold And Associates, P.A. re #180 Notice re Hearing by Attorney, AMENDED (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (McGuire, James) (Kuntz, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE by TIKD Services LLC re #214 Order Notice Pursuant to Court Order (Kuntz, Robert)
August 28, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE by TIKD Services LLC re #202 Response to Motion, #200 Response to Motion Notice of Filing Redacted Expert Report of Rosa M. Abrantes-Metz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kuntz, Robert)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Post-Discovery Hearing Administrative ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/28/2018. See attached document for full details. (jdo)
August 24, 2018 Filing 213 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Discovery Hearing held on 8/24/2018. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 19 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kevin W Cox, Robert J. Kuntz Other appearances: Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. (Digital 15:57:12) (tb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 212 RESPONSE to #204 Statement The Florida Bar Defendants' Response and Objections to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts to be Tried by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. (Cox, Kevin)
August 22, 2018 Filing 211 REPLY to Response to Motion re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. (Cox, Kevin)
August 22, 2018 Filing 210 RESPONSE to #205 Statement of Facts in Support of Summary Judgment by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (McGuire, James)
August 22, 2018 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (McGuire, James)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #199 Agreed Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Response to Defendant's Statement of Material Facts/Plaintiff's Statement of Fact to be Tried. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/21/2018. (ecz)
August 17, 2018 Filing 207 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #43 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, (Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous)Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, , #101 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions for Filing and Maintaining Frivolous Lawsuit Pursuant to Rule 11, #47 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint,, Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Eleventh Circuit Opinion in Watson v. JQC) by Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit (Attachments: #1 Opinion in Laura Watson v. JQC) (Kleppin, Chris)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #198 Agreed and Joint Expedited Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Depose Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses and to Submit Their Expert Disclosures Due to Witnesses' Unavailability. Defendants shall depose Plaintiff's expert witnesses on the first available date amenable to the parties and shall serve expert disclosures subsequent to such depositions within five (5) business days after the conclusion of those depositions. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/17/2018. (ecz)
August 15, 2018 Filing 205 Statement of: Plaintiff's Response to The Ticket Clinic Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by TIKD Services LLC (Kuntz, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Filing 204 Statement of: of Facts to be Tried and Response to The Florida Bar Defendants' Statement of Facts by TIKD Services LLC re #190 Statement, (Kuntz, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Filing 203 APPENDIX Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by TIKD Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 36)(Kuntz, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Filing 202 RESPONSE to Motion re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 8/22/2018. (Kuntz, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Statements of Facts per Local Rule 5.4 by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kuntz, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Filing 200 RESPONSE to Motion re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 8/22/2018. (Kuntz, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 199 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limit For Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts/Plaintiff's Statement of Facts to be Tried by TIKD Services LLC. (Kuntz, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 198 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Depose Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses and to Submit Their Expert Disclosures Due to Witnesses' Unavailability re 194 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by The Florida Bar. Responses due by 8/28/2018 (Cox, Kevin)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #196 Plaintiff TIKD Services LLC's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Response to Ticket Clinic Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/10/2018. (ecz)
August 9, 2018 Filing 196 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Ticket Clinic Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion by TIKD Services LLC. (Kuntz, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE by The Florida Bar re #183 Notice (Other) Second Amended Notice of Hearing (Cox, Kevin)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #192 Agreed Motion To Modify Expert Discovery Schedule. Defendants' Expert Reports are now due on or before August 24, 2018. Expert Discovery is to be completed by September 18, 2018. Daubert Motions are now due on or before September 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/7/2018. (ecz)
August 2, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit re #186 Statement,, of Filing Replacement Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J) (McGuire, James)
August 2, 2018 Filing 192 Agreed MOTION to Modify Expert Discovery Schedule re #90 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuntz, Robert)
August 1, 2018 Filing 191 Consent MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cox, Kevin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 190 Statement of: Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer, The Florida Bar re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Cox, Kevin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Florida Bar, Joshua Doyle, Michelle Suskauer. Attorney Kevin W Cox added to party Joshua Doyle(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Cox added to party Michelle Suskauer(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/15/2018 (Cox, Kevin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 188 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Robert R. Willhoit. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McGuire, James)
August 1, 2018 Filing 187 Statement of: / Declaration of Cherie Pacheco by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law, #186 Statement,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(McGuire, James)
August 1, 2018 Filing 186 Statement of: Material Facts by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T)(McGuire, James)
August 1, 2018 Filing 185 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Responses due by 8/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit )(McGuire, James)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ENDORSED ORDER regarding the #183 amended notice of discovery hearing for August 24, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. Discovery hearings are limited to one hour. The amended hearing notice lists a great number of discovery disputes, and it is inconceivable that the Undersigned will be able to separately address all issues within one hour. As a result, because there appears to be a strong likelihood that the Undersigned will not have time to address all the discovery disputes within the allotted hour, the Undersigned urges the parties to prioritize their discovery disputes. That way, the disputes the parties deem most important will be discussed, even if other disputes must be scheduled for another discovery calendar hearing. In addition, the parties are reminded that the Undersigned will not take up any issues unless both sides have agreed to have that issue heard at a particular date and time. That applies to added-on issues as well. It is not clear from the amended notice of hearing whether both sides have agreed to add-on the additional discovery issues to the August 24th hearing. Lastly, the parties should also not lose sight of the fact that the Undersigned follows Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37, which mandates a fee-shifting award against a losing parties in a discovery dispute unless certain exceptions apply, which, in the Undersigned's experience, seldom do. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/30/2018. (jdo)
July 30, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE by TIKD Services LLC re #176 Notice re Hearing by Attorney AMENDED (Kuntz, Robert)
July 30, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE by Gold And Associates, P.A. re #180 Notice re Hearing by Attorney, AMENDED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (McGuire, James)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ENDORSED ORDER striking #179 Motion To Retain Confidentiality Designations, because it violates the Undersigned's #7 Discovery Procedures Order and paragraph 15 of the #157 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/30/2018. (jdo)
July 30, 2018 Filing 180 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 9/7/2018 04:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (McGuire, James)
July 27, 2018 Filing 179 STRICKEN per DE# 181 , Plaintiff's MOTION To Retain Confidentiality Designations re #152 Stipulation by TIKD Services LLC. (Kuntz, Robert) Modified text on 7/31/2018 (jas).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #177 Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Summary Judgment Motion. The page limit for the Ticket Clinic Defendants' summary judgment motion is hereby enlarged by 10 pages. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/27/2018. (ecz)
July 23, 2018 Filing 177 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Motion by Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (McGuire, James)
July 20, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 8/24/2018 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. (Cox, Kevin)
July 13, 2018 Filing 175 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #43 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, (Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous)Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, , #101 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions for Filing and Maintaining Frivolous Lawsuit Pursuant to Rule 11, #47 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint,, Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit (Attachments: #1 Opinion in Ferguson v. Wade) (Kleppin, Chris)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
July 9, 2018 Filing 173 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Claims Against Individual Bar Defendants by TIKD Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuntz, Robert)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #166 Partially Agreed Motion To Allow Deposition After The Discovery Deadline. The fact discovery deadline is extended to July 25, 2018 to allow the deposition of Mr. Kowitt to take place. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is likewise extended to August 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/5/2018. (ecz)
July 5, 2018 Filing 171 REPLY to #166 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline To Allow Deposition After The Discovery Deadline, #170 Response in Opposition to Motion, by TIKD Services LLC. (Kuntz, Robert)
July 3, 2018 Filing 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re #166 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline To Allow Deposition After The Discovery Deadline filed by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Replies due by 7/10/2018. (Cox, Kevin)
July 2, 2018 Filing 169 Plaintiff's REPLY to #167 Response to Motion, #166 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline To Allow Deposition After The Discovery Deadline by TIKD Services LLC. (Kuntz, Robert)
July 2, 2018 Filing 168 RESPONSE in Opposition re #158 Plaintiff's MOTION Requesting Enforcement of Court's Order Regarding Service on Defendant Mark S. Gold and Motion to Compel Compliance with Deposition Notice filed by Mark S. Gold. Replies due by 7/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Emails Between Denise Shanghai and Eduardo Dieppa, Esq. Re TIKD'S Clients Drivers' Licenses Being Suspended, #2 Emails Between Michelle Santos and Eduardo Dieppa, Esq. re Dieppa's Law Office Providing TIKD with Disposition of Court Case so TIKD Can Inform the Client, #3 TIKD's Services Agreement, Showing that They Are Between the Law Firm and TIKD Legal, L.L.C.)(Kleppin, Chris)
July 2, 2018 Filing 167 RESPONSE to Motion re #166 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline To Allow Deposition After The Discovery Deadline filed by Robert Azcano, Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Replies due by 7/9/2018. (McGuire, James)
July 2, 2018 Filing 166 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline To Allow Deposition After The Discovery Deadline by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuntz, Robert)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ENDORSED ORDER striking #163 Motion to Quash Subpoena, because it violates the Undersigned's #7 Discovery Procedures Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/29/2018. (jdo)
June 29, 2018 Filing 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of Barry Kowitt (Rothman, Joel)
June 29, 2018 Filing 163 STRICKEN MOTION to Quash Subpoena Directed to Barry Kowitt, Esq. by Barry Kowitt. Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party Barry Kowitt(pty:obj). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Barry Kowitt)(Rothman, Joel) Modified to strike per 165 Order on 7/2/2018 (asl).
June 29, 2018 Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of Barry Kowitt (Rothman, Joel)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ENDORSED ORDER concerning the #158 motion requesting enforcement and to compel a deposition. The portion seeking to compel Mark S. Gold's appearance at a deposition violates the Undersigned's #7 Discovery Procedures Order. The parties should seek appropriate relief by following the Undersigned's discovery procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/20/2018. (jdo)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED ORDER granting #159 Agreed Motion To Allow Two Depositions Immediately After The Discovery Deadline. The fact discovery deadline is extended to July 17, 2018 to allow two depositions to take place. Discovery due by 7/17/2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/20/2018. (ecz)
June 18, 2018 Filing 159 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline To Allow Two Depositions Immediately After The Discovery Deadline by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuntz, Robert)
June 15, 2018 Filing 158 Plaintiff's MOTION Requesting Enforcement of Court's Order Regarding Service on Defendant Mark S. Gold and Motion to Compel Compliance with Deposition Notice by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kuntz, Robert)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Stipulated Protective ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/6/2018. (jdo)
June 6, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit of Suggestion of Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (McGuire, James)
May 31, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Riley by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit.(Kleppin, Chris)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Post-Discovery Hearing Administrative ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/29/2018. (jdo)
May 25, 2018 Filing 153 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Discovery Hearing held on 5/25/2018. Total time in court: 55 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Chris Kleppin, James J. McGuire, Kevin W Cox, Markenzy Lapointe, Robert J. Kuntz, Peter D. Kennedy, (Digital 14:26:56) (mso)
May 21, 2018 Filing 152 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by The Florida Bar (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
May 18, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE by Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander of Authorities re May 25, 2018, Discovery Hearing (McGuire, James)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ENDORSED ORDER granting #149 unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear telephonically at discovery hearing. Attorney Peter Kennedy is granted leave to appear telephonically at the discovery hearing scheduled for Friday, May 25, 2018 at 2:30 p.m.The call-in procedures are the following: (1) dial 1-888-684-8852; (2) enter Access Code Number 8004594, followed by the # sign; and (3) enter Security Code Number 1213, followed by the # sign. No cellular use is permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/16/2018. (jdo)
May 16, 2018 Filing 149 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at hearing on May 25, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. . Attorney/Representative: Peter Kennedy by TIKD Services LLC. Responses due by 5/30/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuntz, Robert)
May 16, 2018 Filing 148 SECOND SUPPLEMENT of Anthony Eladio Ramos, To Rule 24 (b)(1)(b) to #124 MOTION to Intervene by Anthony Eladio Ramos (cqs)
May 15, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE by The Florida Bar Requesting for a Status Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lapointe, Markenzy)
May 1, 2018 Filing 146 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by TIKD Services LLC re #32 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by TIKD Services LLC, #20 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lori S. Holcomb, Michael J. Higer, John F Harkness, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar, #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against The Florida Bar Defendants and Memorandum in Support filed by TIKD Services LLC (Kuntz, Robert)
May 1, 2018 Filing 145 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar re #31 Response to Motion filed by TIKD Services LLC, #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, filed by Lori S. Holcomb, Michael J. Higer, John F Harkness, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar, #40 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Lori S. Holcomb, Michael J. Higer, John F Harkness, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar (Cox, Kevin)
April 30, 2018 Filing 144 REPLY to #128 the Notice of Joinder in the Bar Defendants' Response In Opposition to Rule 24 (b)(1)(B) Motion to Intervene of and by Anthony Eladio Ramos. (ebz)
April 27, 2018 Filing 143 REPLY to #127 Response of the Florida Bar Batch of Defendants, to Rule 21 (b)(1)(B) Motion to Intervene by Anthony Eladio Ramos. (ebz)
April 25, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit re #43 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, (Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous)Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, , #101 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions for Filing and Maintaining Frivolous Lawsuit Pursuant to Rule 11, #47 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint,, Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (McGuire, James)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ENDORSED ORDER granting #45 Unopposed Motion for 5-Page Extension for Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/25/2018. (ecz)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Unopposed Motion for 5-Page Extension for Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/25/2018. (ecz)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/25/2018. (ecz)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/25/2018. (ecz)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/25/2018. (ecz)
April 24, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Kirkwood Simpson on behalf of Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Attorney Allison Kirkwood Simpson added to party Robert Azcano(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Kirkwood Simpson added to party Gold And Associates, P.A. (pty:dft), Attorney Allison Kirkwood Simpson added to party Ted L. Hollander(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Kirkwood Simpson added to party Jeffery R. Lotter(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Kirkwood Simpson added to party Robert R. Willhoit(pty:dft). (Simpson, Allison)
April 24, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Richard Caramanica on behalf of Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party Robert Azcano(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party Gold And Associates, P.A. (pty:dft), Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party Ted L. Hollander(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party Jeffery R. Lotter(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party Robert R. Willhoit(pty:dft). (Caramanica, Mark)
April 24, 2018 Filing 134 First SUPPLEMENT of Anthony Eladio Ramos To Rule 24 (b)(1)(B) #124 MOTION to Intervene of Anthony Eladio Ramos (ebz) Modified on 4/24/2018 (ebz).
April 23, 2018 Filing 133 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman, 1-117 pages, Court Reporter: Other, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Designation Access Form)(apz)
April 19, 2018 Filing 132 REPLY to #129 TIKD'S Response in Opposition to Rule 24 (b)(1)(B) Motion to Intervene by Anthony Eladio Ramos. (fjn)
April 16, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 5/25/2018 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. (McGuire, James)
April 16, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 5/25/2018 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. (Kuntz, Robert)
April 13, 2018 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 MOTION to Intervene of Anthony Eladio Ramos filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 4/20/2018. (Kuntz, Robert)
April 13, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit re #127 Response in Opposition to Motion OF JOINDER (McGuire, James)
April 12, 2018 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 MOTION to Intervene by Anthony Eladio Ramos filed by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Replies due by 4/19/2018. (Cox, Kevin)
April 10, 2018 Filing 126 Plaintiff's REPLY to #123 Response/Reply (Other) in support of Statement of Interest of the United States by TIKD Services LLC. (Kuntz, Robert)
April 3, 2018 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #124 of MOTION to Intervene by Anthony Eladio Ramos. (ebz)
April 3, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION to Intervene Rule 24(b)(1)(B) by Anthony Eladio Ramos. (ebz)
April 3, 2018 Filing 123 RESPONSE to #115 Statement of Interest by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (McGuire, James)
March 23, 2018 Filing 122 Defendant's RESPONSE to #115 Statement Department of Justice's Statement of Interest by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. (Cox, Kevin)
March 23, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J. McGuire on behalf of Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Attorney James J. McGuire added to party Robert Azcano(pty:dft), Attorney James J. McGuire added to party Mark S. Gold(pty:dft), Attorney James J. McGuire added to party Gold And Associates, P.A. (pty:dft), Attorney James J. McGuire added to party Ted L. Hollander(pty:dft), Attorney James J. McGuire added to party Jeffery R. Lotter(pty:dft), Attorney James J. McGuire added to party Robert R. Willhoit(pty:dft). (McGuire, James)
March 23, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregg Darrow Thomas on behalf of Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party Robert Azcano(pty:dft), Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party Mark S. Gold(pty:dft), Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party Gold And Associates, P.A. (pty:dft), Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party Ted L. Hollander(pty:dft), Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party Jeffery R. Lotter(pty:dft), Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party Robert R. Willhoit(pty:dft). (Thomas, Gregg)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ENDORSED ORDER granting #118 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Statement of Interest on Behalf of the United States of America. Response due on or before April 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/23/2018. (ecz)
March 23, 2018 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #115 Statement by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kleppin, Chris)
March 12, 2018 Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion re #100 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #80 Amended Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10], AlternativelyDefendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Process if In Fact Service Has Been Effectuated filed by Mark S. Gold. (Kleppin, Chris)
March 12, 2018 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #101 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions for Filing and Maintaining Frivolous Lawsuit Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Kleppin, Chris)
March 12, 2018 Filing 115 Statement of: Statement of Interest on Behalf of the United States of America by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mintz, Steven)
March 9, 2018 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #94 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery Proceedings Pending Resolution of Their Motion to Dismiss [DOC 17] and Incorporated Memorandum o filed by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. (Cox, Kevin)
March 5, 2018 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Motion re #101 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions for Filing and Maintaining Frivolous Lawsuit Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 3/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kuntz, Robert)
March 5, 2018 Filing 112 RESPONSE to Motion re #100 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #80 Amended Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10], AlternativelyDefendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Process if In Fact Service Has Been Effectuated filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 3/12/2018. (Kuntz, Robert)
March 2, 2018 Filing 111 RESPONSE to Motion re #94 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery Proceedings Pending Resolution of Their Motion to Dismiss [DOC 17] and Incorporated Memorandum o filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 3/9/2018. (Kuntz, Robert)
February 22, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's Order of Referral to Mediation by TIKD Services LLC re #90 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,,,,, (Kuntz, Robert)
February 21, 2018 Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re #104 Defendant's MOTION for Judicial Notice (the Motion is Now Unopposed) filed by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Kleppin, Chris)
February 20, 2018 Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion re #104 Defendant's MOTION for Judicial Notice filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 2/27/2018. (Kuntz, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE by TIKD Services LLC Notice of Filing Declaration of Robert J. Kuntz, Jr., Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration) (Kuntz, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION to Have Their Motions to Dismiss Directed to the Initial Complaint be Deemed Directed and Timely Filed in Response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Kleppin, Chris)
February 20, 2018 Filing 105 Defendant's MOTION Unopposed Request for Judicial Notice of Florida Supreme Court's Order to Show Cause by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 104 Defendant's MOTION for Judicial Notice by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Attachments: #1 Order to Show Cause Issued by the Supreme Court of Florida to Plaintiff, dated Jan. 30, 2018, #2 Letter from Supreme Court of Florida Stating that It Is Actively Supervising Lawyers in the State of Florida and Neither its Members Nor It Collectively Are Active Market Participants, dated Jan. 20, 2016)(Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2018 Filing 103 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #100 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #80 Amended Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10], AlternativelyDefendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Process if In Fact Service Has Been Effectuated (Declaration of Mark Gold) filed by Mark S. Gold. (Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2018 Filing 102 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #69 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10] (Declaration of Mark Gold) filed by Mark S. Gold. (Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2018 Filing 101 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions for Filing and Maintaining Frivolous Lawsuit Pursuant to Rule 11 by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ted Hollander, #2 Settlement Agreement in State Court Suits - TIKD v. The Ticket Clinic, #3 Complaint in State Court Brought by TIKD v. The Ticket Clinic, #4 Complaint in State Court Brought by The Ticket Clinic v. TIKD, #5 Affidavit of Jeffrey Lotter, #6 Affidavit of Robert Willhoit, #7 Affidavit of Robert Azcano, #8 Letter from Supreme Court of Florida to The Florida Bar re North Carolina Board of Dental Examiners, #9 Order to Show Cause from the Supreme Court of Florida Issued to TIKD, dated Jan. 30, 2018)(Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2018 Filing 100 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #80 Amended Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10], Alternatively ( Responses due by 3/5/2018), Defendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Process if In Fact Service Has Been Effectuated by Mark S. Gold. (Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Striking #98 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #80 Amended Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10] filed by Mark S. Gold by Mark S. Gold (Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2018 Filing 98 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #80 Amended Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10] by Mark S. Gold. Responses due by 3/5/2018 (Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2018 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10] filed by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter. (Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2018 Filing 96 Defendant's MOTION to Adopt/Join #94 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery Proceedings Pending Resolution of Their Motion to Dismiss [DOC 17] and Incorporated Memorandum o f Law by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Kleppin, Chris)
February 16, 2018 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, (Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous)Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, , #47 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint,, Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Attachments: #1 Order to Show Cause Issued by the Supreme Court of Florida to Plaintiff, dated Jan. 31, 2018, #2 Letter from Supreme Court of Florida Stating that It Is Actively Supervising Lawyers in the State of Florida and Neither its Members Nor It Collectively Are Active Market Participants, dated Jan. 20, 2016)(Kleppin, Chris)
February 16, 2018 Filing 94 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery Proceedings Pending Resolution of Their Motion to Dismiss [DOC 17] and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Responses due by 3/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
February 12, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE by TIKD Services LLC re 75 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kuntz, Robert)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ENDORSED ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Mark Gold's Motion to Dismiss. Reply due on or before February 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/9/2018. (ecz)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ENDORSED ORDER granting #88 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Ticket Clinic's Motion to Dismiss. Reply due on or before February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/9/2018. (ecz)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: ( Jury Trial set for 11/26/2018 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 11/21/2018 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2018., Expert Discovery due by 8/24/2018., Fact Discovery due by 7/13/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 4/13/2018., Final proposed jury instructions and verdict form Deadline 11/16/2018., In Limine Motions due by 10/12/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2018., Daubert and Markman Motions due by 8/31/2018., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/12/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 9/7/2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/9/2018. (tm) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 9, 2018 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #82 Response to Motion, by Mark S. Gold. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kleppin, Chris)
February 9, 2018 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #81 Response to Motion,, by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kleppin, Chris)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ENDORSED ORDER granting #83 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief. Responses due on or before February 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/9/2018. (ecz)
February 9, 2018 Filing 86 Clerks Notice to Filer re #83 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Damages And Injunctive Relief re #80 Amended Complaint,,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
February 8, 2018 Filing 85 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by TIKD Services LLC (Kuntz, Robert)
February 8, 2018 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TIKD Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent TIKD LLC, a Delaware limited liability company for TIKD Services LLC (Kuntz, Robert)
February 8, 2018 Filing 83 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #80 Amended Complaint by Robert Azcano, Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Responses due by 2/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court Order to Show Cause, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kleppin, Chris) Modified Relief on 2/9/2018 (ls).
February 5, 2018 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10] filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Kuntz, Robert)
February 2, 2018 Filing 81 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, (Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous)Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, , #47 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint,, Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 2/9/2018. (Kuntz, Robert)
January 29, 2018 Filing 80 First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief against Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar, Robert R. Willhoit filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Kuntz, Robert)
January 29, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Striking #78 Amended Complaint,, filed by TIKD Services LLC by TIKD Services LLC (Kuntz, Robert)
January 29, 2018 Filing 78 STRICKEN per DE#79 , First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief against Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar, Robert R. Willhoit filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Kuntz, Robert) Modified text on 1/30/2018 (jas).
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED ORDER granting #76 Agreed Motion for Withdrawal of Remaining Motion to Disqualify Without Prejudice and to Terminate Deadlines for Supplemental Briefing. The Motion for Disqualification is treated as withdrawn without prejudice subject to the terms stated in the Motion. The January 26, 2018 deadline for supplemental briefing (ECF No. 59) is TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/26/2018. (ecz)
January 26, 2018 Filing 76 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw Document #18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Agreed Motion for Withdrawal of Remaining Motion to Disqualify Without Prejudice and to Terminate Deadlines for Supplemental Briefing by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Responses due by 2/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENDORSED ORDER granting #73 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Mark S. Gold and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint In Order to Obtain Substitute Service On Mark S. Gold. Plaintiff (1) has leave to file an amended complaint to include the jurisdictional allegations required for it to obtain substitute service on Gold under Florida law, and (2) shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order to serve Gold. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/26/2018. (ecz)
January 25, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE by TIKD Services LLC re 72 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,,,, to Modify Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing (Kuntz, Robert)
January 25, 2018 Filing 73 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Mark S. Gold and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint In Order to Obtain Substitute Service On Mark S. Gold by TIKD Services LLC. Responses due by 2/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kuntz, Robert)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER granting the #71 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ramon A. Abadin terminated.However, the Court notes that an earlier Order [ECF No. 59] requires the parties to, by January 26, 2018, file supplemental memoranda on the still-pending motion to disqualify (as it relates to Plaintiff's Texas-based co-counsel). Thus, TIKD and the Defendants are still required to submit the memoranda concerning the flagged issues as they relate to the argument that any disqualification of Mr. Abadin should also be imputed to his co-counsel. On the other hand, if Texas co-counsel also seeks to withdraw, or if the Defendants rescind their opposition to the continued involvement of attorney Peter Kennedy and the Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, P.C. law firm, then there will be no need for the memoranda. If the need for the memoranda evaporates, then counsel shall timely advise the Court through an appropriate and timely notice and motion. On the other hand, if Mr. Kennedy and his firm are going to remain involved as counsel for Plaintiff TIKD, then the memoranda are due (from both sides) and they will need to also formally arrange for a new "local counsel" (a term not actually in the applicable rule) to substitute for Mr. Abadin. [The Court acknowledges that the unopposed motion to withdraw mentions that attorney Robert Kuntz will act as local counsel, but Mr. Kuntz will need to follow through and file an appropriate notice or motion on CM/ECF.]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/24/2018. (jdo)
January 24, 2018 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ramon A. Abadin, P.A.. by TIKD Services LLC. Responses due by 2/7/2018 (Abadin, Ramon)
January 23, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Kuntz on behalf of TIKD Services LLC. Attorney Robert J. Kuntz added to party TIKD Services LLC(pty:pla). (Kuntz, Robert)
January 22, 2018 Filing 69 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, for the Failure of the Plaintiff to Serve Process and Plaintiff's Two Violations of the Court Order on Service [D.E. 10] by Mark S. Gold. Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party Mark S. Gold(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/5/2018 (Kleppin, Chris)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENDORSED ORDER granting #60 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Responses to the Ticket Clinic Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Responses due on or before February 2, 2018. Responses due by 2/2/2018 Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/22/2018. (ecz)
January 18, 2018 Filing 67 Defendant's NOTICE OF JOINDER (MOTION to Adopt/Join) IN THE OTHER TICKET CLINIC #47 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint, Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ted L. Hollander. (Attachments: #1 Letter, Dated Jan. 20, 2016 from Chief Justice Labarga of the Supreme Court of Florida stating that for Purposes of North Carolina State Bd. of Dental Examiners v. FTC, 135 S.Ct. 1101 (2015) the Supreme Court of Florida is not an "Active Market Participant" and is Engaged in "Active Supervision" of Actions and Policies that Impact the Legal Profession)(Kleppin, Chris) Modified text/status per Chambers on 1/18/2018 (sk).
January 18, 2018 Filing 66 Notice of Adoption by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit Related document: #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, filed by Lori S. Holcomb, Michael J. Higer, John F Harkness, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar (Attachments: #1 Letter, Dated Jan. 20, 2016 from Chief Justice Labarga of the Supreme Court of Florida stating that for Purposes of North Carolina State Bd. of Dental Examiners v. FTC, 135 S.Ct. 1101 (2015) the Supreme Court of Florida is not an "Active Market Participant" and is Engaged in "Active Supervision" of Actions and Policies that Impact the Legal Profession) (Kleppin, Chris)
January 17, 2018 Filing 65 Clerks Notice to Filer re #62 MOTION to Seal re ECF No. #58 per Order authorizing the submission of this document under seal. Wrong Event Selected - Document is not a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A Notice event must always be selected when filing a Notice. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (dgj)
January 16, 2018 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman, 1-117 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2018. (apz)
January 16, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 63 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1598578)
January 16, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SEALED FILING pursuant to this Court's post-hearing administrative Order authorizing the submission of this document under seal by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. (Cox, Kevin) Modified text on 1/17/2018 (dgj).
January 12, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE by TIKD Services LLC re #32 Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Abadin, Ramon)
January 12, 2018 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #43 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, (Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous)Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, , #47 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint,, Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abadin, Ramon)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Supplemental Post-Hearing Administrative ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/10/2018. (jdo)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Post-Hearing Administrative ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/9/2018. (jdo)
January 9, 2018 Filing 57 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2018 re #18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Lori S. Holcomb, Michael J. Higer, John F Harkness, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): David B. Rothman, Jeanne T. Melendez, Chris Kleppin, Kevin W Cox, Markenzy Lapointe, Dominic C. MacKenzie, Ramon A. Abadin, Peter D. Kennedy, and Mr. Nagen appeared by telephone to listen to hearing. (Digital 14:29:44) (mso)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ramon A. Abadin, #18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Lori S. Holcomb, Michael J. Higer, John F Harkness, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar On page 17 of his response [ECF No. 36] opposing the Florida Bar Defendants' Motion to Disqualify [ECF No. 18], Mr. Abadin contends that the made written "submissions on behalf of TIKD" in connection with his representation of TIKD in connection with the UPL investigation. The memorandum also notes that these submissions "raised potential antitrust issues." Mr. Abadin's purpose in raising these points is to demonstrate that the Florida Bar never "raised even a slight concern regarding Mr. Abadin's continued representation of TIKD until the antitrust suit was filed in federal court."The Undersigned would like to review those submissions and, if possible, to review them during the hearing. Therefore, to the extent logistically possible, the Undersigned asks that Mr. Abadin bring copies of those submissions to Court for this afternoon's hearing. If he cannot arrange for those documents to be delivered by the start of the hearing, then perhaps he can arrange for them to delivered during the hearing, which surely will last more than an hour. If possible, additional copies should be available for the parties and the Undersigned's law clerk.The Undersigned regrets the short notice. If delivery of copies is not feasible, then Mr. Abadin can file them on the record tomorrow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/9/2018. (JG)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED ORDER granting DE #50 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/8/2018. (mso)
January 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2018 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. (mso)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 *Endorsed Order, ( MOTION Hearing re: DE #18 reset for 1/9/2018 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman.) **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/8/2018. (mso)
January 8, 2018 Filing 53 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/8/2018. Motion hearing re: DE #18 scheduled for 1/9/2018 the time has been moved to 2:30pm Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): David B. Rothman, Chris Kleppin, Kevin W Cox, Markenzy Lapointe, Ramon A. Abadin, David A. King, (Digital 11:30:59) (mso)
January 7, 2018 Filing 52 Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to January 9, 2018 Hearing by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar (Cox, Kevin)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENDORSED ORDER setting Telephonic Conference for 1/8/2018 at 11:30 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman, to discuss Defendants' eleventh-hour motion to reschedule a hearing that has been scheduled since December 15, 2017. The parties shall abide by the following call-in procedure: (1) dial 1-888-684-8852; (2) enter Access Code Number 8004594, followed by the # sign; and (3) enter Security Code Number 1213, followed by the # sign. No cellular telephone use is permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/5/2018. (jdo)
January 5, 2018 Filing 50 Defendant's MOTION Defendants Gold & Associates, P.A., Ted Hollander, Robert Azcano, Jeffery R. Lotter, And Robert R. Willhoit's Partially Unopposed Motion to Reschedule The Time Set For The Oral Argument On Disqualification Motion re 30 Endorsed Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set/Reset Hearings,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings, (Partially Unopposed) by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kleppin, Chris) Modified relief on 1/8/2018 (asl).
January 5, 2018 Filing 49 Clerks Notice to Filer re #48 Reply to Response to Motion,. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
January 4, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY to #36 Response to #18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cox, Kevin). Modified to add document link on 1/5/2018. (jas).
January 4, 2018 Filing 47 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, , Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint,, ( Responses due by 1/18/2018), Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/18/2018) by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ted Hollander, #2 Settlement Agreement in State Court Cases Between TIKD and The Ticket Clinic, #3 Complaint in State Court Suit Brought by TIKD, #4 State Court Suit Brought by The Ticket Clinic, #5 Affidavit of Jeffery Lotter, #6 Affidavit of Robert Willhoit, #7 Affidavit of Robert Azcano)(Kleppin, Chris)
January 4, 2018 Filing 46 Defendant's NOTICE OF JOINDER IN #18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. (Kleppin, Chris) Modified on 1/8/2018 (ra).
January 4, 2018 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages 5-Page Extension For Their Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction And Failure to State A Claim And Other Grounds by Robert Azcano, Gold And Associates, P.A., Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party Robert Azcano(pty:dft), Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party Gold And Associates, P.A. (pty:dft), Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party Jeffery R. Lotter(pty:dft), Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party Robert R. Willhoit(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kleppin, Chris)
January 3, 2018 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel (Peretz, Chesal, and Herrmann, P.L. substituted out and replaced by Glasser & Kleppin, P.A.) by Ted L. Hollander (Kleppin, Chris)
January 2, 2018 Filing 43 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, (Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous), Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, by Ted L. Hollander. Responses due by 1/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ted Hollander, #2 Settlement Agreement Between TIKD, Inc. and The Ticket Clinic, #3 State Court Lawsuit Brought by The Ticket Clinic Against TIKD, Inc., #4 State Court Lawsuit Brought by TIKD, Inc. Against The Ticket Clinic)(Kleppin, Chris)
January 2, 2018 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (5 Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss) by Ted L. Hollander. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kleppin, Chris)
December 28, 2017 Filing 41 Clerks Notice to Filer re #40 Reply to Response to Motion,. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
December 22, 2017 Filing 40 REPLY to #31 Response to #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, filed by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. (Cox, Kevin) Modified to add document link on 12/28/2017 (jas).
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER re 30 Endorsed Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set/Reset Hearings,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings, #38 Notice of Adoption filed by Ramon A. Abadin, #37 Response to Motion filed by TIKD Services LLC, #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ramon A. Abadin.This Order concerns the January 9, 2018 hearing on the Defendants' disqualification motion and any additional briefing which might be filed before that hearing.In an earlier Order [ECF No. 30], the Undersigned granted a motion to reschedule the hearing (from a date in December, 2017) and to extend the deadline for responses to the motion. However, the motion did not mention any requested extension for the optional reply (and that double-spaced reply must not exceed ten (10) pages, excluding signature block and certificate of service).If Defendants wish to file an optional reply to either Mr. Abadin's response [ECF No. 36] or the response filed by Plaintiff TIKD Services LLC [ECF No. 37], then the deadline to do so is January 4, 2018. However, to the extent that Defendants wish to reply to the two separate responses, they must do so in one omnibus reply.Any notices of supplemental authority must be filed by January 7, 2018.Finally, the procedures and guidelines for the hearing which were outlined in the initial scheduling order remain intact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/21/2017. (JG)
December 20, 2017 Filing 38 Notice of Adoption by Ramon A. Abadin Related document: #37 Response to Motion filed by TIKD Services LLC, #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ramon A. Abadin (Melendez, Jeanne)
December 19, 2017 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 12/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Abadin, Ramon)
December 19, 2017 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Ramon A. Abadin. Attorney Jeanne T. Melendez added to party Ramon A. Abadin(pty:ip). Replies due by 12/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ramon A. Abadin)(Melendez, Jeanne)
December 19, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar re #27 Order Setting Hearing on Motion Notice of Filing of Communications Concerning Requested Disqualification Pursuant to Court's Order (Doc. 27) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Cox, Kevin)
December 19, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B. Rothman on behalf of Ramon A. Abadin. Attorney David B. Rothman added to party Ramon A. Abadin(pty:ip). (Rothman, David)
December 18, 2017 Filing 33 Clerks Notice to Filer re #32 Reply to Response to Motion,. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
December 15, 2017 Filing 32 REPLY to #20 Response to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against The Florida Bar Defendants and Memorandum in Support filed by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Abadin, Ramon) Modified to add document link on 12/18/2017 (jas).
December 15, 2017 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, filed by TIKD Services LLC. Replies due by 12/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Abadin, Ramon)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 unopposed motion to continue hearing on Defendants' motion for disqualification and for extension of time to file response to disqualification motion. Response due by 12/19/2017. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2018 at 10:30 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/15/2017. (jdo)
December 14, 2017 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Disqualification and for Leave to File Responses to Said Motion on or before Tuesday, December 29, 2017 ( Responses due by 12/28/2017), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Response to Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abadin, Ramon)
December 13, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by TIKD Services LLC. (Abadin, Ramon)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Scheduling Hearing on #18 Motion to Disqualify Counsel for 12/29/2017 at 10:30 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/12/2017. (jdo)
December 11, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chris Kleppin on behalf of Ted L. Hollander. Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party Ted L. Hollander(pty:dft). (Kleppin, Chris)
December 8, 2017 Filing 25 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Robert Azcano. Attorney Steven Ira Peretz added to party Robert Azcano(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peretz, Steven)
December 7, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dominic C. MacKenzie on behalf of John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Attorney Dominic C. MacKenzie added to party John F Harkness(pty:dft), Attorney Dominic C. MacKenzie added to party Michael J. Higer(pty:dft), Attorney Dominic C. MacKenzie added to party Lori S. Holcomb(pty:dft), Attorney Dominic C. MacKenzie added to party Jacquelyn P. Needelman(pty:dft), Attorney Dominic C. MacKenzie added to party The Florida Bar(pty:dft). (MacKenzie, Dominic)
December 7, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerome Wayne Hoffman on behalf of John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Attorney Jerome Wayne Hoffman added to party John F Harkness(pty:dft), Attorney Jerome Wayne Hoffman added to party Michael J. Higer(pty:dft), Attorney Jerome Wayne Hoffman added to party Lori S. Holcomb(pty:dft), Attorney Jerome Wayne Hoffman added to party Jacquelyn P. Needelman(pty:dft), Attorney Jerome Wayne Hoffman added to party The Florida Bar(pty:dft). (Hoffman, Jerome)
December 7, 2017 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by TIKD Services LLC. Robert Azcano served on 11/22/2017, answer due 12/13/2017. (Abadin, Ramon)
December 7, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Markenzy Lapointe on behalf of John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Attorney Markenzy Lapointe added to party John F Harkness(pty:dft), Attorney Markenzy Lapointe added to party Michael J. Higer(pty:dft), Attorney Markenzy Lapointe added to party Lori S. Holcomb(pty:dft), Attorney Markenzy Lapointe added to party Jacquelyn P. Needelman(pty:dft), Attorney Markenzy Lapointe added to party The Florida Bar(pty:dft). (Lapointe, Markenzy)
December 6, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against The Florida Bar Defendants and Memorandum in Support filed by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Replies due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cox, Kevin)
December 1, 2017 Filing 19 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Gold And Associates, P.A., Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Robert R. Willhoit. Attorney Steven Ira Peretz added to party Gold And Associates, P.A. (pty:dft), Attorney Steven Ira Peretz added to party Ted L. Hollander(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Ira Peretz added to party Jeffery R. Lotter(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Ira Peretz added to party Robert R. Willhoit(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peretz, Steven)
December 1, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Responses due by 12/15/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John F. Harkness, Jr., #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Cox, Kevin)
December 1, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, by John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar. Attorney Kevin W Cox added to party John F Harkness(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Cox added to party Michael J. Higer(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Cox added to party Lori S. Holcomb(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Cox added to party Jacquelyn P. Needelman(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Cox added to party The Florida Bar(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/15/2017 (Cox, Kevin)
November 30, 2017 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by TIKD Services LLC. Jeffery R. Lotter served on 11/22/2017, answer due 12/13/2017. (Abadin, Ramon)
November 28, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by TIKD Services LLC. Robert R. Willhoit served on 11/13/2017, answer due 12/4/2017. (Abadin, Ramon)
November 28, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by TIKD Services LLC. Ted L. Hollander served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Abadin, Ramon)
November 28, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by TIKD Services LLC. Gold And Associates, P.A. served on 11/13/2017, answer due 12/4/2017. (Abadin, Ramon)
November 22, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against The Florida Bar Defendants and Memorandum in Support by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 Riley Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 Simon Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 McKee Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 White Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Abadin, Ramon)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Peter D. Kennedy and David A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/9/2017. (jdo)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER EXPEDITING SERVICE, (Expedited Service Deadline 1/9/2018.) Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/9/2017. (tm)
November 9, 2017 Filing 9 Notice of Court Practice re Joint Motions Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/9/2017. (tm)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/9/2017. (tm)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/9/2017. (tm)
November 8, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Peter D. Kennedy and David A. King. Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 113C-10173705 by TIKD Services LLC. Responses due by 11/22/2017 (Attachments: #1 Certification David A. King, #2 Certification Peter D. Kennedy, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Abadin, Ramon)
November 8, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Robert Azcano, Mark S. Gold, Gold And Associates, P.A., John F Harkness, Michael J. Higer, Lori S. Holcomb, Ted L. Hollander, Jeffery R. Lotter, Jacquelyn P. Needelman, The Florida Bar, Robert R. Willhoit. (jas)
November 8, 2017 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jas)
November 8, 2017 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jas)
November 8, 2017 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
November 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10173266, filed by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summon(s) The Florida Bar, #10 Summon(s) Michael J. Higer, #11 Summon(s) John F. Harkness, #12 Summon(s) Lori S. Holcomb, #13 Summon(s) Jacquelyn P. Needelman, #14 Summon(s) Gold and Associates, P.A., #15 Summon(s) Mark S. Gold, #16 Summon(s) Ted L. Hollander, #17 Summon(s) Robert Azcano, #18 Summon(s) Jeffery R. Lotter, #19 Summon(s) Robert R. Willhoit)(Abadin, Ramon)
November 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10173266, filed by TIKD Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summon(s) The Florida Bar, # 10 Summon(s) Michael J. Higer, # 11 Summon(s) John F. Harkness, # 12 Summon(s) Lori S. Holcomb, # 13 Summon(s) Jacquelyn P. Needelman, # 14 Summon(s) Gold and Associates, P.A., # 15 Summon(s) Mark S. Gold, # 16 Summon(s) Ted L. Hollander, # 17 Summon(s) Robert Azcano, # 18 Summon(s) Jeffery R. Lotter, # 19 Summon(s) Robert R. Willhoit)(Abadin, Ramon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIKD Services LLC v. The Florida Bar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Gold
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Represented By: James J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Florida Bar
Represented By: Jerome Wayne Hoffman
Represented By: Dominic C. MacKenzie
Represented By: Markenzy Lapointe
Represented By: Kevin W Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Higer
Represented By: Jerome Wayne Hoffman
Represented By: Dominic C. MacKenzie
Represented By: Markenzy Lapointe
Represented By: Kevin W Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery R. Lotter
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Represented By: Steven Ira Peretz
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Represented By: Allison Kirkwood Simpson
Represented By: James J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Harkness
Represented By: Jerome Wayne Hoffman
Represented By: Dominic C. MacKenzie
Represented By: Markenzy Lapointe
Represented By: Kevin W Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Willhoit
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Represented By: Steven Ira Peretz
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Represented By: Allison Kirkwood Simpson
Represented By: James J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori S. Holcomb
Represented By: Jerome Wayne Hoffman
Represented By: Dominic C. MacKenzie
Represented By: Markenzy Lapointe
Represented By: Kevin W Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Azcano
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Represented By: Steven Ira Peretz
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Represented By: Allison Kirkwood Simpson
Represented By: James J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn P. Needelman
Represented By: Jerome Wayne Hoffman
Represented By: Dominic C. MacKenzie
Represented By: Markenzy Lapointe
Represented By: Kevin W Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted L. Hollander
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Represented By: Steven Ira Peretz
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Represented By: Allison Kirkwood Simpson
Represented By: James J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold And Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Represented By: Steven Ira Peretz
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Represented By: Allison Kirkwood Simpson
Represented By: James J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Suskauer
Represented By: Kevin W Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Doyle
Represented By: Kevin W Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIKD Services LLC
Represented By: Peter D. Kennedy
Represented By: Ramon A. Abadin
Represented By: David A. King
Represented By: Robert J. Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?