Gomez v. GIONI INCORPORATED et al

Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Defendant: Opentable, Inc. and GIONI INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2018cv22881
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
0 Judge: Federico A Moreno
1 Judge: Edwin G Torres
2 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by GIONI INCORPORATED. (Morales, Suhaill)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss by September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/7/2018. (dpa)
September 5, 2018 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #18 Response to Motion, by GIONI INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morales, Suhaill)
August 31, 2018 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiff's response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Gioni Incorporated's Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Andres Gomez. Replies due by 9/7/2018. (Perez, Anthony)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file his response to the motion to dismiss by August 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/24/2018. (dpa)
August 24, 2018 16 Clerks Notice to Filer re #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss dated August 10, 2018[Doc 9] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss dated August 10, 2018 re #9 Def. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 24, 2018 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Andres Gomez. Responses due by 9/7/2018 (Perez, Anthony) Modified Relief/Link on 8/24/2018 (ls).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall adhere to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures, and Judge Torres' Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures. Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures and Judge Torres' Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures are available at the Court's website: # http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/content/judge-kathleen-m-williams. Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/24/2018. (d pa)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 CORRECTED ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Federico A. Moreno recused. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (koa)
August 13, 2018 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Opentable, Inc.. (Vance, Kevin)
August 13, 2018 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Suhaill Machado Morales on behalf of GIONI INCORPORATED. Attorney Suhaill Machado Morales added to party GIONI INCORPORATED(pty:dft). (Morales, Suhaill)
August 10, 2018 9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by GIONI INCORPORATED. Attorney Susan Potter Norton added to party GIONI INCORPORATED(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Norton, Susan)
August 8, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Opentable, Inc.. Attorney Kevin Eugene Vance added to party Opentable, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vance, Kevin)
August 8, 2018 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Andres Gomez. GIONI INCORPORATED served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018. (Perez, Anthony)
July 25, 2018 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Andres Gomez. Opentable, Inc. served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Perez, Anthony)
July 20, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Notice of Court Practice, Verified Certificate of Plaintiff's Counsel Regarding Prior Filings Under the Americans with Disabilities Act by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Andres Gomez (Perez, Anthony)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 Order Requiring Verified Certificate of Counsel Regarding Any Prior Filings Under the Americans with Disabilities Act. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a verified response to this order on or before July 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (koa)
July 17, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to GIONI INCORPORATED, Opentable, Inc. (bb)
July 17, 2018 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
July 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10824870, filed by Andres Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons as to Gioni, #3 Summon(s) Summons as to Opentable)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. GIONI INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opentable, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Eugene Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIONI INCORPORATED
Represented By: Susan Potter Norton
Represented By: Suhaill Machado Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?