Lexi Development Company, Inc. v. Regions Bank

Appellee: Regions Bank
Appellant: Lexi Development Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23128
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
0 Judge: Ursula Ungaro
1 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER ON REGIONS' MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL. Motion to Dismiss Appeal DE #11 is GRANTED. This appeal is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All deadlines and hearings are CANCELED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 29, 2018 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Lexi Development Company, Inc.. Replies due by 9/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Ostroff, Eric)
August 29, 2018 12 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Initial Brief by Lexi Development Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Ostroff, Eric)
August 17, 2018 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Regions Bank. Responses due by 8/31/2018 (Yates, Brian)
August 16, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 08/16/2018. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
August 6, 2018 9 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Regions Bank. (Yates, Brian)
August 2, 2018 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Stuart Garbett on behalf of Regions Bank. Attorney David Stuart Garbett added to party Regions Bank(pty:e). (Garbett, David)
August 2, 2018 7 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Regions Bank (Yates, Brian)
August 2, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank identifying Corporate Parent Regions Financial Corporation for Regions Bank (Yates, Brian)
August 1, 2018 5 Featured Case Order Regarding Appellate Briefs, Record Transcripts, And Requests For Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
August 1, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb)
August 1, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
August 1, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Lexi Development Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
August 1, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 16-1754-AJC, filed by Lexi Development Company, Inc..(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexi Development Company, Inc. v. Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Regions Bank
Represented By: Brian P Yates
Represented By: David S. Garbett
Represented By: Philip A. Allen, III
Represented By: David Stuart Garbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lexi Development Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Matthew Wasserkrug
Represented By: Peter Dumas Russin
Represented By: Eric W. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?