McDermott v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: John McDermott
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23203
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint re Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1, 3, 4, 5, 9 by John McDermott. Responses due by 10/18/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Eduardo)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 9/30/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 9/26/2019 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by John McDermott (Hernandez, Eduardo)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Paul Hehir for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Alcivar, Natasha)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties by John McDermott (Hernandez, Eduardo)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Natasha K. Alcivar added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Alcivar, Natasha)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John McDermott (Hernandez, Eduardo)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (jas)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10886231, filed by John McDermott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hernandez, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermott v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Natasha K. Alcivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McDermott
Represented By: Eduardo Jesus Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?