U.S. Bank National Association v. Plumer
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Richard Plumer, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv23405
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #6 Transmittal Letter Sent, #5 Order Remanding Case to State Court (drz)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order Remanding Case to State Court by Richard Plumer, II. (drz)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Richard Plumer, II to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: CyberSpaceIntl@gmail.com (drz)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing State Records by Richard Plumer, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (drz)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing State Court Records by Richard Plumer, II re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) (drz)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit Court in Miami-Dade, FL. State Court Case Number: 13-20103-CA-01 (pes)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Remanding Case to State Court. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (kpe)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Plumer, II. (kpe)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Richard Plumer, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Plumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Plumer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?