Lightwire, LLC v. VMR Products, LLC
Plaintiff: Lightwire, LLC
Defendant: VMR Products, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv23408
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/2/2018 Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles For Judge Kathleen M. Williams. on 10/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Lightwire, LLC by VMR Products, LLC. Attorney Richard Guerra added to party VMR Products, LLC(pty:dft). (Guerra, Richard)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Loyde Hillyer on behalf of VMR Products, LLC. Attorney Gregory Loyde Hillyer added to party VMR Products, LLC(pty:dft). (Hillyer, Gregory)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lightwire, LLC Return of Service (Crosby, Kevin)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall adhere to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures, and Judge Torres' Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures. Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures and Judge Torres' Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures are available at the Court's website: # http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/content/judge-kathleen-m-williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/23/2018. (jws)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to VMR Products, LLC. (cbr)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (cbr)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VMR Products, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10931114, filed by Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summon(s))(Crosby, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightwire, LLC v. VMR Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lightwire, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMR Products, LLC
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Represented By: Gregory Loyde Hillyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?