Moss v. Celebrity Cruises Inc
Plaintiff: Karen Moss
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv23530
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Karen Moss (Winkleman, Michael)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises Inc (Ginsberg, Randy)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises Inc. Attorney Randy Scott Ginsberg added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc(pty:dft). (Ginsberg, Randy)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#6]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Karen Moss. Celebrity Cruises Inc served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. See image at DE #5 (lk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Karen Moss. Celebrity Cruises Inc served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Weiner, Marc)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. (ail)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10953005, filed by Karen Moss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Winkleman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Celebrity Cruises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Moss
Represented By: Michael A. Winkleman
Represented By: Marc E Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc
Represented By: Randy Scott Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?