Figueiredo v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Sally Figueiredo
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23605
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Paul Hehir for Celebrity Cruises Inc. (Alcivar, Natasha)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER For Pretrial Conference and Trial: Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2018. Discovery due by 3/29/2019. Expert Discovery due by 3/29/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2018. Motions due by 4/19/2019. Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/3/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/10/2019 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 6/5/2019 at 1:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Sally Figueiredo (Shenkman, David)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/24/2018. Alternatively, the Parties may file the Report by 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Attorney Natasha K. Alcivar added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc.(pty:dft). (Alcivar, Natasha)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Sally Figueiredo. Celebrity Cruises Inc. served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (Shenkman, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sally Figueiredo. (Shenkman, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc.. (jas)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 9 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. (pes)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Sally Figueiredo. (See DE#8 for image). (jas)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sally Figueiredo (Shenkman, David)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: ( -Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/19/2018, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2018 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Celebrity Cruises Inc.. (Shenkman, David)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed (Shenkman, David)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pes)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pes)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Sally Figueiredo. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10964446, filed by Sally Figueiredo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Notice of Filing)(Shenkman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueiredo v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Sally Figueiredo
Represented By: David Michel Shenkman
Represented By: Charles Garret White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Represented By: Natasha K. Alcivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?