Pineda v. U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Omar Pineda
Defendant: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23778
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment and Notice of Acceptance of Defendant's Offer of Judgment filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. Replies due by 10/29/2018. (Garrard, Amy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Garrard, Amy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment and Notice of Acceptance of Defendant's Offer of Judgment by Omar Pineda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Offer of Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kozolchyk, Elliot)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Gregory P. Abrams and Alexander E. Preller ; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Gregory P. Abrams and Alexander E. Preller. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/2/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Security Associates Holdings, Inc. for U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Garrard, Amy)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Garrard, Amy)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alexander E. Preller. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11038817 by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Alexander E. Preller, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Garrard, Amy)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gregory P. Abrams. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11038398 by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory P. Abrams, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Garrard, Amy)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Garrard on behalf of U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. Attorney Amy Garrard added to party U.S. Security Associates, Inc.(pty:dft). (Garrard, Amy)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Court Practice re FLSA Cases Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (lh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10993646, filed by Omar Pineda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Statement of Claim)(Kozolchyk, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pineda v. U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Pineda
Represented By: Elliot Ari Kozolchyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander E. Preller
Represented By: Amy Garrard
Represented By: Gregory P. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?