Philpot v. Lightning Marketing Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Lightning Marketing Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv24022
Filed: September 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald L Graham
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lightning Marketing Group, LLC. (dj)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Larry G. Philpot (Parwani, Rinky)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (dj)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Larry G. Philpot of filing of Civil Cover Sheet (Parwani, Rinky)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Larry G. Philpot of filing of Civil Cover Sheet (Parwani, Rinky)
September 30, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (dj) Modified on 10/1/2018 (dj).
September 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Larry G. Philpot against Lightning Marketing Group, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11036299, filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Parwani, Rinky)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Lightning Marketing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightning Marketing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Rinky S. Parwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?