Tim Hortons USA, Inc. et al v. Tims Milner LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tim Hortons USA, Inc. and Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc.
Defendant: Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Nicole Wilski, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Milner LLC and Tims 8 Mile LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv24152
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski identifying Other Affiliate Kava Restaurants LLC, Other Affiliate Thomas R. Reedy for Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Nicole Wilski, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC (Siminovsky, Alaina)
December 6, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International Inc., a Canadian Corporation for Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Greene, Nina)
December 6, 2018 Filing 21 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Greene, Nina)
December 6, 2018 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greene, Nina)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before December 5, 2018, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 18 Defendants ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Nicole Wilski, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Siminovsky, Alaina)
November 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Mitchell Einhorn on behalf of Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski. Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Baby Buford Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Jimmy Rahaim(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims 12 Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims 8 Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Compuware LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Evergreen LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Five-Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Greenfield LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Tims Milner LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Nicole Wilski(pty:dft). (Einhorn, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendants' shall file their Response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before November 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski. Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Baby Buford Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Jimmy Rahaim(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims 12 Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims 8 Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Compuware LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Evergreen LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Five-Mile LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Greenfield LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Tims Milner LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alaina Brooke Siminovsky added to party Nicole Wilski(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siminovsky, Alaina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Baby Buford Holdings LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims Evergreen LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims Compuware LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Nicole Wilski served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Jimmy Rahaim served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims Greenfield LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims Five-Mile LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims 8 Mile LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims 12 Mile LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. Tims Milner LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Greene, Nina)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baby Buford Holdings LLC, Jimmy Rahaim, Tims 12 Mile LLC, Tims 8 Mile LLC, Tims Compuware LLC, Tims Evergreen LLC, Tims Five-Mile LLC, Tims Greenfield LLC, Tims Milner LLC, Nicole Wilski. (jas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11058089, filed by Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc., Tim Hortons USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Tims Milner LLC, #3 Summon(s) Tims 12 Mile LLC, #4 Summon(s) Tims 8 Mile LLC, #5 Summon(s) Tims Five-Mile LLC, #6 Summon(s) Tims Greenfield LLC, #7 Summon(s) Nicole Wilski, #8 Summon(s) Jimmy Rahaim, #9 Summon(s) Tims Evergreen LLC, #10 Summon(s) Tims Compuware LLC, #11 Summon(s) Baby Buford Holdings LLC)(Greene, Nina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tim Hortons USA, Inc. et al v. Tims Milner LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Hortons USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nina Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Donut U.S. Limited, Inc.
Represented By: Nina Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tims 12 Mile LLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tims Greenfield LLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baby Buford Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Wilski
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Rahaim
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tims Evergreen LLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tims Compuware LLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tims Five-Mile LLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tims Milner LLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tims 8 Mile LLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Alaina Brooke Siminovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?