Neusom v. Holland et al

Appellee: Brian Holland and Andrea Holland
Appellant: Thomas G. Neusom
Case Number: 1:2018cv24463
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER DENYING #9 Appellant Thomas Neusom's Motion for Rehearing of the Denial of the Emergency Motion for Stay During Pendency of the Appeal to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (koa)
December 17, 2018 10 NOTICE by Thomas G. Neusom re #5 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal, Order Vacating Dismissal (Neusom, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 9 MOTION for Rehearing of the Denial of the Emergency Motion re #8 Order on Motion to Stay, by Thomas G. Neusom. (ebz) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (ebz). Modified text on 12/14/2018 (ebz).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER denying #6 Attorney Thomas Neusom's Emergency Motion for Stay During Pendency of the Appeal to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (koa)
November 27, 2018 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay by Andrea Holland, Brian Holland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through F)(Ikpe, Utibe)
November 13, 2018 6 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay During Pendency of the Appeal to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel by Thomas G. Neusom. Responses due by 11/27/2018. (jas)
November 8, 2018 5 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal for Failure by Appellant(s) to Timely File Designation or Statement of Issues, Closing Case. Signed by US Bankruptcy Judge A. Jay Cristol on 11/8/2018. See attached document for full details. (jc)
October 25, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
October 25, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
October 25, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Thomas G. Neusom (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
October 25, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-15825-AJC, filed by Thomas G. Neusom.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neusom v. Holland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brian Holland
Represented By: Utibe Inyang Ikpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Andrea Holland
Represented By: Utibe Inyang Ikpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Thomas G. Neusom
Represented By: Thomas Grant Neusom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?