MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC et al v. AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability and MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC, and AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC
Case Number: 1:2018cv24497
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #18 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, "Threshold Issue" by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Baird, Lisa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 Defendant's REPLY , MEMORANDUM of Law Regarding the "Threshold Issue" Pursuant to the Order Dated December 3, 2018 by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baird, Lisa)
December 13, 2018 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on 11-30-2018 before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck, 1-10 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino (Whitmarsh), 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2019. (dwh)
December 12, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 Memorandum, #18 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI. (Ruiz, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM of Law re #18 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, re "Threshold Issue" by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baird, Lisa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Hasan Ruiz on behalf of MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI (Ruiz, John)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part #16 Motion for Order Permitting Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and Motion for Extension of Time. Motions due by 12/7/2018. Responses due by 12/12/2018 Replies due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (cqs) Modified on 12/3/2018 (ch1).
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2018. Total time in court: 20 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Edward Maurice Mullins, Lisa Marie Baird, John Hasan Ruiz, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino (Whitmarsh), 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00)
November 30, 2018 PAPERLES NOTICE to Set Hearing Re. DE 16: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 10:15 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel for both parties are instructed to take the following steps shortly before the scheduled hearing time so that the telephonic hearing may begin promptly: Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852. Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign. Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign. State your name and enter the conference. For technical assistance, please call 800-526-2655. (ac00)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Order Permitting Expedited Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and, MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #14 Motion to Remand ( Responses due by 12/12/2018) by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Baird, Lisa) .
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Order to Show Cause) (Ruiz, John)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI. (Ruiz, John) .
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 12/10/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baird, Lisa)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion for Transfer Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8 and Internal Operating Procedure Sections 2.06.00 and 2.15.00. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Reassign Case by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Baird, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI (Ruiz, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI identifying Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC, Other Affiliate RD Legal Finance, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Law Firm for Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI; Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Law Firm, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability; Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Law Firm, Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC for MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC (Ruiz, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Hasan Ruiz on behalf of MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI (Ruiz, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Baird, Lisa)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC. Answer due 11/26/2018; AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,. Answer due 11/26/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc.. Answer due 11/26/2018; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Answer due 11/26/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/30/2018. (ac00)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olivos, Christina)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Attorney Lisa Marie Baird added to party AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Marie Baird added to party AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Marie Baird added to party Endo Health Solutions Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Marie Baird added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft). (Baird, Lisa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Endo International PLC for AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Olivos, Christina)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11112329, filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,, Endo Health Solutions Inc., AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Mullins, Edward) no answer/or Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 10/29/2018 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC et al v. AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mao-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series PMPI
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Baird
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Christina Olivos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Baird
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Christina Olivos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC,
Represented By: Lisa Marie Baird
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Christina Olivos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDING INC
Represented By: Lisa Marie Baird
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Christina Olivos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?