MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and SERIES PMPI
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv24546
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Lerner, Joshua)
December 20, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Ruiz, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. Replies due by 12/27/2018. (Ruiz, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 27 Unopposed NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI of Extension of Time to Select Mediator (Ruiz, John) Modified Text on 12/21/2018 (ls).
December 13, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. Replies due by 12/20/2018. (Lerner, Joshua)
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Boston Scientific Corporation. Responses due by 12/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lerner, Joshua)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss; granting #23 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge( Corrected Motion due by 12/7/2018.). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 5, 2018 Filing 23 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion to Dismiss and Strike by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lerner, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint,, and Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. Replies due by 12/10/2018. (Ruiz, John)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference reset for 1/11/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Ruiz, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Boston Scientific Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Lerner, Joshua)
November 19, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI re #16 Order on Motion to Seal, #12 Amended Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) (Ruiz, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint,, and Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Boston Scientific Corporation. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lerner, Joshua)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (nc)
November 12, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation identifying Other Affiliate FMR LLC, Other Affiliate Abigail Johnson for Boston Scientific Corporation (Lerner, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 14 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (648372)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit Q Attached to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint per Local Rule 5.4 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Ruiz, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Pure Bill of Discovery against Boston Scientific Corporation filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, SERIES PMPI, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Ruiz, John) Modified Text on 11/13/2018 (ls).
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI identifying Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA Claims 1, LLC; Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC, Other Affiliate RD Legal Finance, LLC for SERIES PMPI (Ruiz, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Hasan Ruiz on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI (Ruiz, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's October 31, 2018 Order by Boston Scientific Corporation re #4 Order, Set Answer Due Deadline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pretrial Order #188 dated June 21, 2018) (Mirilovic, Lena)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance With This Court's Order Dated October 31, 2018 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI re #4 Order, Set Answer Due Deadline (Ruiz, John)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/21/2018, Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2018 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/2/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Order dismissing without prejudice #1 Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lerner, Joshua)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Boston Scientific Corporation response due 11/6/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11119098, filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R)(Lerner, Joshua) Text Modified on 10/31/2018 No answer/motion to dismiss filed(pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Lena Marguerite Mirilovic
Represented By: Joshua D. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Jasmine Jas
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Jasmine Jas
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: Jasmine Jas
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?