MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC. et al v. Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC and MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Defendant: Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv24653
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-36) transferring case to the Southern District of California re: MDL 2452 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Battaglia. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (mc)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending MDL Transfer. Proceedings in this matter are stayed pending a final decision from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation whether to transfer this action to MDL No. 2452. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.. Responses due by 12/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vrasmasu, Mihai)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Paul E. Boehm is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendant for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Boehm at pboehm@wc.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery, LLC, Corporate Parent RD Legal Finance, LLC for Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC; Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA Claims 1, LLC (Ruiz, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Hasan Ruiz on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC (Ruiz, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to the Complaint by Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vrasmasu, Mihai)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul E. Boehm. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11145367 by Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.. Responses due by 11/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Paul E. Boehm, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vrasmasu, Mihai)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co. Inc. for Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp. (Vrasmasu, Mihai)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11137278, filed by Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vrasmasu, Mihai) Modified on 11/6/2018 (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC. et al v. Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Mihai Marian Vrasmasu
Represented By: Paul E. Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?