Martinez v. State Of Florida

Plaintiff: Erickson Martinez
Respondent: State Of Florida
Case Number: 1:2018cv24835
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Patrick A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #11 Notice of Appeal, filed by Erickson Martinez. Date received by USCA: 1/8/19. USCA Case Number: 19-10091-C. (hh)
January 8, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (hh)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appeal by Erickson Martinez as to #9 Order on Report and Recommendations. Filing fee $ 505.00 Receipt#: FEE NOT PAID. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (COA denied see de#9 ) (hh)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 1/2/2019. (br)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations re: #7 Report and Recommendations, #1 Complaint filed by Erickson Martinez. Certificate of Appealability: DENIED. ; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (jao)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS to Judge's Report Findings #7 Report and Recommendations by Erickson Martinez. (drz)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Erickson Martinez; Recommending that petitioners habeas petition (DE#1) be DISMISSED, with prejudice, as untimely; that no certificate of appealability issue; that final judgment be entered; and that the case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing On-line Florida Court dockets and certain documents to be made part of the instant record. Clerk mailed a copy of all Exhibits to Petitioner. (Attachments: (Main Attachment) Exhibit 1, #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8) (fbn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #8 Exhibit 8) (fbn).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (bb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-01326. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER: this case is transferred to the Southern District of Florida for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall immediately forward the file to that District and close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/14/2018. (MGG)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -State. filed by Erickson Martinez. (no filing fees paid, no IFP, no service copies, post mark dated 11/7/2018)(TSW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. State Of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erickson Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?