James v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tonya James
Defendant: Prosper Marketplace, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC, TD Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv24869
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. by Tonya James (Zeig, Justin)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff must respond to Motion by January 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/18/2019. (chd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #7 Statement of Claim by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taormina, Alisa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tonya James. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeig, Justin)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Dismissing Party Prosper Marketplace, Inc. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
January 7, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Prosper Marketplace Inc by Tonya James (Zeig, Justin)
January 7, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD Bank, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate TD Bank, N.A., Other Affiliate TD Bank US Holding Company, Other Affiliate Toronto-Dominion Bank, Other Affiliate TD Group US Holdings LLC for TD Bank, N.A. (Melendez, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per DE#27. Responses due by 1/18/2019 (cqs)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time and #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Other). Defendants Capital One Bank and Chase Bank must file responses to the Statement of Claim by January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/4/2019. (chd)
January 4, 2019 Filing 26 Clerks Notice to Filer re #25 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. ERROR . The Filer failed to add the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the mediator. (lbc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Tonya James. (Zeig, Justin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taormina, Alisa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Compliance by TD Bank, N.A. re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Melendez, Brian)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #7 Statement of Claim by TD Bank, N.A.. (Melendez, Brian)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Stephens, Megan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Responses due by 1/17/2019 (Stephens, Megan)
December 31, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to The Statement of Claim re #12 Scheduling Order, by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Attorney Megan Perkins Stephens added to party Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/14/2019 (Stephens, Megan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate Chase Bank USA, N.A. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Taormina, Alisa)
December 27, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Tonya James by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taormina, Alisa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian C Frontino on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Brian C Frontino added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Frontino, Brian)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alisa M Taormina on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Alisa M Taormina added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Taormina, Alisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by TD Bank, N.A.. (Melendez, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Melendez on behalf of TD Bank, N.A. (Melendez, Brian)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Philip Flick on behalf of TD Bank, N.A.. Attorney Charles Philip Flick added to party TD Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Flick, Charles)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Y. Libman on behalf of TD Bank, N.A.. Attorney Shawn Y. Libman added to party TD Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Libman, Shawn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance With Nov 27, 2018 Court Order by Tonya James (Zeig, Justin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Statement of: Claims by Tonya James (Zeig, Justin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by TD Bank, N.A.. Attorney Brian Melendez added to party TD Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Melendez, Brian)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Prosper Marketplace, Inc., TD Bank, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., filed by Tonya James.(Zeig, Justin)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 1/28/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Prosper Marketplace, Inc., TD Bank, N.A.. (cds)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Financial Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Prosper Marketplace, Inc., TD Bank, N.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11177826, filed by Tonya James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) capital one, #3 Summon(s) chase, #4 Summon(s) equifax, #5 Summon(s) prosper, #6 Summon(s) TD)(Zeig, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya James
Represented By: Justin E. Zeig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Shawn Y. Libman
Represented By: Charles Philip Flick
Represented By: Brian Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa M Taormina
Represented By: Brian C Frontino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Megan Perkins Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?