HB Fresh Inc. v. Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: HB Fresh Inc.
Defendant: Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc. and Alejandro Badilla
Case Number: 1:2018cv24946
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Set Aside Default, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc.. (ls)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HB Fresh Inc. re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment , #13 Memorandum, (Barmat, Marc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment by HB Fresh Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Hurtado, #2 Declaration of Marc Barmat, #3 Declaration of Blake Surbey, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Barmat, Marc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment by HB Fresh Inc.. (Barmat, Marc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HB Fresh Inc. re #10 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default (Barmat, Marc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Entry of Default as to Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc., Alejandro Badilla - Motions Terminated: #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/8/2019. (ls)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by HB Fresh Inc.. (Barmat, Marc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by HB Fresh Inc.. All Defendants. (Barmat, Marc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HB Fresh Inc. (Barmat, Marc)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz For Judge Williams on 12/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alejandro Badilla. (ls)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc.. (ls)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ls)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ls)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alejandro Badilla, Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11193015, filed by HB Fresh Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Barmat, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HB Fresh Inc. v. Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HB Fresh Inc.
Represented By: Marc Philip Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Badilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?