Duchesnay Inc. v. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Duchesnay Inc.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv25015
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. (DE 7). Upon review of the notice and the record, the Court ORDERS AND ADJUDGES that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All deadlines and hearings are CANCELED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/15/2019. (eft)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Duchesnay Inc. (Tuchman Meyers, Terri)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and Notice of Court Practice and Procedures. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz for Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Duchesnay Inc. (Tuchman Meyers, Terri)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) by Duchesnay Inc. (mc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11202759, filed by Duchesnay Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Information for Patent Cases)(Tuchman Meyers, Terri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duchesnay Inc. v. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duchesnay Inc.
Represented By: Terri Ellen Tuchman Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?