Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. v. Ades et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Defendant: Manuel Saba Ades and Alberto Saba Ades
Case Number: 1:2018cv25142
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. 1 et seq. Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, and for Improper Venue filed by Alberto Saba Ades, Manuel Saba Ades. (Levin, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 22 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Scheduling Conference held on 1/29/2019. Total time in court: 12 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Joseph Clay Coates, III, Brian Levin (Digital 11:01:40) (tb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Motion re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. 1 et seq. Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, and for Improper Venue, #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Incorporated Memo of Law in Support of Motion filed by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. Replies due by 2/1/2019. (Coates, Joseph) Modified title text on 1/28/2019 (mc).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to reschedule telephonic scheduling conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. The parties shall abide by the following call-in procedure: (1) dial 1-888-684-8852; (2) enter Access Code Number 8004594, followed by the # sign; and (3) enter Security Code Number 1213, followed by the # sign. No cellular telephone use is permitted. All counsel shall have their calendars available so that the Court can pinpoint a special set trial date workable to all counsel and the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/23/2019. (km03)
January 22, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION Reschedule of 01.25.19 Telephonic Scheduling Conference re 17 Order,,, Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, Plaintiff's Revised Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Telephonic Scheduling Conference Set for 01.25.19 by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coates, Joseph)
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Telephonic Scheduling Conference Set for 01.25.19 re 17 Order,,, Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coates, Joseph)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER setting a Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 1/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. The parties shall abide by the following call-in procedure: (1) dial 1-888-684-8852; (2) enter Access Code Number 8004594, followed by the # sign; and (3) enter Security Code Number 1213, followed by the # sign. No cellular telephone use is permitted. All counsel shall have their calendars available so that the Court can pinpoint a special set trial date workable to all counsel and the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/16/2019. (km03)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Plaintiff has until January 25, 2019 to file a reply in support of its #5 Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/16/2019. (km03)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for trial. Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned in this case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Incorporated Memo of Law in Support of Motion by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coates, Joseph)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Incorporated Memo of Law in Support of Motion filed by Alberto Saba Ades, Manuel Saba Ades. Replies due by 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Account Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - December 2014 Account Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jose Luis Llamas, #4 Exhibit 4 - Brokercheck Report of Jose Luis Llamas, #5 Exhibit 5 - Thomas Bowers Brokercheck Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 17, 2013 E-mail regarding the Note, #7 Exhibit 7 - Statement of Claim)(Levin, Brian)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. 1 et seq. , Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, and for Improper Venue by Alberto Saba Ades, Manuel Saba Ades. Responses due by 1/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Account Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - December 2014 Account Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jose Luis Llamas, #4 Exhibit 4 - Brokercheck Report of Jose Luis Llamas, #5 Exhibit 5 - Thomas Bowers Brokercheck Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 17, 2013 E-mail regarding the Note, #7 Exhibit 7 - Respondent's Statement of Answer and Reservation of Rights, #8 Exhibit 8 - Statement of Claim)(Levin, Brian)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Fees from Prayer for Relief in its Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief (Coates, Joseph)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. and Saba Parties of Election to Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (Coates, Joseph)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 Judicial Disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (km03)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Levin on behalf of Alberto Saba Ades, Manuel Saba Ades. Attorney Brian Levin added to party Alberto Saba Ades(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Levin added to party Manuel Saba Ades(pty:dft). (Levin, Brian)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (smz)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alberto Saba Ades, Manuel Saba Ades. (kpe)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Incorporated Memo of Law in Support of Motion by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Coates, Joseph)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Directed to Manuel Saba Ades and Alberto Saba Ades by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Coates, Joseph)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade as the county with the filer. (jua)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Manuel Saba Ades, Alberto Sabe Ades. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11219672, filed by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Arbitration Statement of Claim), #2 Exhibit 2 (FINRA Arbitration Rule 12200), #3 Exhibit Declaration of Vijay Dewan (with Exhibits), #4 Summon(s) Directed to Manuel Saba Ades, #5 Summon(s) Directed to Alberto Saba Ades, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coates, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. v. Ades et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Saba Ades
Represented By: Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Saba Ades
Represented By: Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Clay Coates, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?