Gethers v. United states
Plaintiff: Annette Gethers
Defendant: United states
Case Number: 1:2018cv25167
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Annette Gethers. Annette Gethers served on 1/8/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Spector, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Annette Gethers. Annette Gethers served on 1/9/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Spector, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Annette Gethers. All Plaintiffs. (Spector, Robert)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 3/10/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STRIKING #5 Notice of Filing Discovery filed by Annette Gethers. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Request To Produce by Annette Gethers.(Spector, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United states, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mee)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (mee)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Gethers against United States. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11226625, filed by Annette Gethers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Spector, Robert)Text Modified on 12/11/2018 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gethers v. United states
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United states
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Gethers
Represented By: Robert Leslie Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?