Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Pagan
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC and Dish Network L.L.C.
Defendant: Norberto Pagan
Case Number: 1:2018cv25241
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #9 Defendant's pro se Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 15, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. Moreover, the parties are instructed to timely comply with this Court's Order requiring a joint scheduling report and proposed order #4 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Defendant. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/8/2019. (ean)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Response to the #1 Complaint by Norberto Pagan. (mc)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant Norberto Pagan's pro se Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant Norberto Pagan shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 11, 2019. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Defendant Norberto Pagan. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/10/2019. (ean)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Norberto Pagan. (ebz)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. Norberto Pagan served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Boatman, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish DBS Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH Orbital Corporation, Other Affiliate The Boatman Law Firm, P.A. for Dish Network L.L.C.; Corporate Parent EchoStar Corporation, Corporate Parent Kudelski SA, Corporate Parent Nagra USA, Inc., Other Affiliate The Boatman Law Firm, P.A. for Nagrastar LLC (Boatman, James)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norberto Pagan. (amb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norberto Pagan. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11240564, filed by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Boatman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norberto Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?