Guzman v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eleazar Guzman
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv25266
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. (cbr)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jacob W. Hippensteel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/21/2018. (km03)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jacob Hippensteel. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11262278 by Eleazar Guzman. Responses due by 1/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Certification, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Gear, Trescot)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Eleazar Guzman re #1 Complaint, filed by Eleazar Guzman, 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Gear, Trescot)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (smz)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (pcs)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (pcs)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11244758, filed by Eleazar Guzman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Gear, Trescot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleazar Guzman
Represented By: Trescot Joseph Gear
Represented By: Jacob W. Hippensteel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?