Redland District Golf & Country Club, Inc. v. Blackboard U.S. Holding, Inc.
Plaintiff: Redland District Golf & Country Club, Inc.
Defendant: Blackboard U.S Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv25339
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added K & A Mediation. (Qadri, Amanda)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. ERROR. Parties/Mediator Not Added Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the mediator. (lbc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Blackboard U.S Holding, Inc.. (Qadri, Amanda)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL. Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2019. Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/22/2019. In Limine Motions due by 7/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. Motions due by 7/19/2019. Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/2/2019. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 9/11/2019 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Redland District Golf & Country Club, Inc. for dates of 1/30/19 to 2/1/19 (Petrie, Justin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Blackboard U.S Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling)(Qadri, Amanda)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Disclosure(s) of Pursuant to Rule 26(a) by Blackboard U.S Holding, Inc. (Qadri, Amanda)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Disclosure(s) of PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Redland District Golf & Country Club, Inc. (Petrie, Justin)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro). ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 1/18/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Blackboard U.S Holding, Inc.. (Qadri, Amanda)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Responses due by 12/26/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11256764, filed by Blackboard U.S. Holding, Inc. d/b/a Hamilton Specialty Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Qadri, Amanda) Text Modified on 12/20/2018 (cds). State Motion To Dismiss Filed (Exhibit C)/ No Answer Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redland District Golf & Country Club, Inc. v. Blackboard U.S. Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redland District Golf & Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Petrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackboard U.S Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Tanaz Salehi
Represented By: Amanda Qadri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?