Miami Waterkeeper, Inc. v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: Miami Waterkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 1:2018cv25360
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE #9 : U.S. Army Corps of Engineers response due 3/13/2019. (lk)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint by March 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Raurell, Carlos)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Defendants' Motion to Stay Action in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Action Pending Lapse in Appropriations by U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/28/2019 (Raurell, Carlos)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Jurisdiction when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (pcs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Army Corps Of Engineers, United States. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11260545, payment transferred from : 18-cv-25355, Waterkeeper v. Corps of Engineers, filed by Miami Waterkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit Ex A, #5 Exhibit Ex B, #6 Exhibit Ex C, #7 Exhibit Ex D, #8 Exhibit Ex E, #9 Exhibit Ex F, #10 Exhibit Ex G, #11 Exhibit Ex H)(Kaiman, Catherine) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (jua).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miami Waterkeeper, Inc. v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Waterkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie Ann Malloy
Represented By: Catherine Millas Kaiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?