Wheeler et al vs NCL(Bahamas)LTD
Plaintiff: George Walchusky, Penny Patricia Hambly, Melanie Korman, Suzanne Goble, Stacy Curcio, Mary Schuster, Alex Goble, John Doe, Sarah Wheeler, James Raffa, E. H., Michel Korman, Olga Semeran, S. C., Geremiah Wheeler, D. B., C. L., Amy Lau, Jeremy Cohen, Carlos Fernando Cruz Sanchez, Richard Scott, Kailey Savve, A. C., Tara Patricia Hambly, N. P., Timothy Reynolds, R. V., Ann Pardi, Judith Stepanski, Kevin Farrah, Karen McIntyre, Laurie Rail, Tanya Maria Cruz Sanchez, Sarah Schmidt, William Kenneth Goble, Fernando Cruz Contreras, Kaitly Bonneville, Jeremey Korman, Lisa Walchusky, H. H., Katherine DeMaio, N. B., Jamie Mauricio Sanchez Morales, G. W., Thomas Stepanski, Jessica Goble, Christopher Betro, A. K., Russ Semeran, R. W., Eddie Herrero, Denise Scott, Paul Semeran, J. K., Ella Morro, Dawn Pannell, Suzi Korman, Silvia Patricia Sanchez Baker, G. C., Maria Herrero, M. W., A. L., Malgorzata Bonneville and Gail Sanchez
Defendant: NCL(Bahamas)LTD.
Case Number: 1:2018cv25374
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND REFERRAL Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per Order of Consolidation on DE #18 Closing Case. (jao)
February 12, 2019 Cases associated. (jao)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Marcia G. Cooke for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 2/8/2019. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Cancelling Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 02/01/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by NCL(Bahamas)LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seitz, William)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Geremiah Wheeler (Holzberg, Glenn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis Maxwell Holzberg on behalf of Geremiah Wheeler. Attorney Louis Maxwell Holzberg added to party Geremiah Wheeler(pty:pla). (Holzberg, Louis)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to Show Cause, by Geremiah Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Related Cases)(Holzberg, Glenn)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Ashley Levitt on behalf of NCL(Bahamas)LTD.. Attorney Lauren Ashley Levitt added to party NCL(Bahamas)LTD.(pty:dft). (Levitt, Lauren)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff SHALL show good cause in writing by Thursday, January 24, 2019, as to why Plaintiff has not filed a Joint Report. Further, Plaintiff SHALL file a Joint Report by such date. (Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by NCL(Bahamas)LTD. re #8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions of Filing Agreed Motion to Transfer, Consolidate and Consent to Magistrate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Motion to Transfer, Consolidate, and Consent to Magistrate) (Seitz, William)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by NCL(Bahamas)LTD. (Seitz, William)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Seitz on behalf of NCL(Bahamas)LTD.. Attorney William Robert Seitz added to party NCL(Bahamas)LTD.(pty:dft). (Seitz, William)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geremiah Wheeler. All Defendants. (Holzberg, Glenn)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/18/2019, Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2019 before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
January 3, 2019 Reset Hearings per #5 to add time. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. (asl)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Dismissing Party N. B., Christopher Betro, Kaitly Bonneville, A. C., A. C., G. C., S. C., Jeremy Cohen, Fernando Cruz Contreras, Carlos Fernando Cruz Sanchez, Tanya Maria Cruz Sanchez, Stacy Curcio, Katherine DeMaio, John Doe, Kevin Farrah, Alex Goble, Jessica Goble, Suzanne Goble, William Kenneth Goble, E. H., E. H., H. H., Penny Patricia Hambly, Tara Patricia Hambly, Eddie Herrero, Maria Herrero, A. K., J. K., Jeremey Korman, Melanie Korman, Michel Korman, Suzi Korman, A. L., C. L., Amy Lau, Karen McIntyre, Ella Morro, N. P., Dawn Pannell, Ann Pardi, James Raffa, Laurie Rail, Timothy Reynolds, Gail Sanchez, Silvia Patricia Sanchez Baker, Jamie Mauricio Sanchez Morales, Kailey Savve, Sarah Schmidt, Mary Schuster, Denise Scott, Richard Scott, Olga Semeran, Paul Semeran, Russ Semeran, Judith Stepanski, Thomas Stepanski, R. V., G. W., M. W., R. W., George Walchusky, Lisa Walchusky, Sarah Wheeler, Malgorzata Bonneville and D. B. re #1 Complaint,,,, Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (drz)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NCL(Bahamas)LTD.. (drz)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against NCL. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11263069, filed by Lisa Walchusky, N. P., Denise Scott, Katherine DeMaio, Ann Pardi, Carlos Fernando Cruz Sanchez, H. H., Tara Patricia Hambly, Ella Morro, Jeremey Korman, Fernando Cruz Contreras, A. K., N. B., Richard Scott, Christopher Betro, Dawn Pannell, Mary Schuster, A. C., William Kenneth Goble, Kailey Savve, Tanya Maria Cruz Sanchez, Alex Goble, Karen McIntyre, Laurie Rail, G. C., Maria Herrero, J. K., Paul Semeran, Michel Korman, Kaitly Bonneville, Jeremy Cohen, Thomas Stepanski, John Doe, R. V., D. B., Melanie Korman, Sarah Wheeler, Penny Patricia Hambly, Geremiah Wheeler, Jamie Mauricio Sanchez Morales, A. L., Silvia Patricia Sanchez Baker, Eddie Herrero, Olga Semeran, Malgorzata Bonneville, Jessica Goble, C. L., Suzi Korman, E. H., Timothy Reynolds, Judith Stepanski, Amy Lau, Russ Semeran, Gail Sanchez, Sarah Schmidt, M. W., Kevin Farrah, Stacy Curcio, Suzanne Goble, S. C., James Raffa, G. W., George Walchusky, R. W.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit Notice Letters)(Holzberg, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler et al vs NCL(Bahamas)LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Walchusky
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Patricia Hambly
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Korman
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Goble
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Curcio
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Schuster
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Goble
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Wheeler
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Raffa
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. H.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Korman
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Semeran
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geremiah Wheeler
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Represented By: Louis Maxwell Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. B.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. L.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lau
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Cohen
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Fernando Cruz Sanchez
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kailey Savve
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Patricia Hambly
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. P.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Reynolds
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. V.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Pardi
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Stepanski
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Farrah
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McIntyre
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Rail
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Maria Cruz Sanchez
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Schmidt
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kenneth Goble
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Cruz Contreras
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitly Bonneville
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremey Korman
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Walchusky
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. H.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine DeMaio
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. B.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Mauricio Sanchez Morales
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. W.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stepanski
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Goble
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Betro
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Semeran
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. W.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Herrero
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Scott
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Semeran
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. K.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Morro
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Pannell
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzi Korman
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Patricia Sanchez Baker
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. C.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Herrero
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. W.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. L.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malgorzata Bonneville
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Sanchez
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCL(Bahamas)LTD.
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Levitt
Represented By: William Robert Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?