United States of America v. Roy
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ankur Roy and Lorenzo J. Palomares Starbuck
Case Number: 1:2018mc20898
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade (Office: Miami)
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Andrea M Simonton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Motion to Compel
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF LIVE, Ver 6.2.1 as case 1:18-cv-02223, filed 03/28/2018. (jua)
March 28, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:18-mc-20898 electronically transferred out to Illinois Northern. (lbc)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant Ankur Roy's Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois his Emergency Motion to Compel. #8 . Non-party Lorenzo J. Palomares Starbuck filed a response in opposition #11 and Defendant filed a reply. #12 . The matter was referred to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton, who issued a Report and Recommendation #13 recommending that Defendant's Motion to Transfer #8 be GRANTED and that the case be closed. No objections were filed. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the Response, the Report and Recommendation, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation #13 is ADOPTED. Defendant's Motion to Transfer is GRANTED and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/27/2018. (jm01) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
March 21, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #8 Defendant's Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois. Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2018. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 3/21/2018. (cmh)
March 19, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION MOTION OF ANKUR ROY TO (i) TRANSFER TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS HIS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL HIS FORMER ATTORNEY TO COMPLY WITH A SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS WITHIN 24 HOURS AND (ii) CLOSE THIS CASE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW re filed by Ankur Roy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cone, Timothy)
March 19, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION MOTION OF ANKUR ROY TO (i) TRANSFER TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS HIS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL HIS FORMER ATTORNEY TO COMPLY WITH A SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS WITHIN 24 HOURS AND (ii) CLOSE THIS CASE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW re filed by Lorenzo J. Palomares Starbuck. Replies due by 3/26/2018. (Navarro, Luis)
March 16, 2018 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Requiring Filing of Expedited Response to Ankur Roy's Motion to Transfer, ECF No. #8 . Defendant Ankur Roy has moved to transfer his pending Emergency Motion to Compel, ECF No. #1 , to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, which issued the subpoena addressed in the Defendant's Motion to Compel, in advance of an evidentiary hearing scheduled to take place before that court on April 6, 2018. Therefore, non-party Lorenzo Starbuck is directed to file his response to the Defendant's Motion to Transfer on or before March 20, 2018, to ensure there is adequate time to address the merits of any remaining issues raised in the Defendant's Emergency Motion to Compel. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 3/16/2018. (cmh)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE. Defendant, Ankur Roy, Moved to Compel his former attorney to comply with a subpoena for documents #1 . This Motion #1 was referred to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on March 14, 2018 6 . Now, Petitioner seeks to transfer the Motion to Compel #1 to the Northern District of Illinois and close this case #8 . PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned cause is hereby referred to Judge Simonton to issue a Report and Recommendation with respect to the Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois #8 . Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/16/2018. (jm01)
March 15, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION MOTION OF ANKUR ROY TO (i) TRANSFER TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS HIS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL HIS FORMER ATTORNEY TO COMPLY WITH A SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS WITHIN 24 HOURS AND (ii) CLOSE THIS CASE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,, by Ankur Roy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cone, Timothy)
March 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Lorenzo J. Palomares Starbuck re Supplemental Production of Documents (Navarro, Luis)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned cause is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton to take all necessary and proper action as required by law regarding the Emergency Motion to Compel Former Attorney to Comply with Subpoena for Documents #1 . Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/14/2018. (jm01)
March 14, 2018 Attorney Joshua D. Greenberg terminated per 3/14/18 Paperless Order. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Joshua Greenberg. (asl)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings #3 . Local Rule 4 of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys requires "[a]n attorney who is a member in good standing of the bar of any United States Court [...] but is not admitted to practice in the Southern District of Florida may, upon written application filed by counsel admitted to practice in this District, be permitted to appear and participate in a particular case." Here, the Motion #3 fails to comply with the requirement that local counsel sign the Motion. Consequently, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion #3 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #3 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/14/2018. (jm01)
March 9, 2018 Filing 5 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua D. Greenberg. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10471193 filed by Ankur Roy. (Cone, Timothy)
March 9, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Ankur Roy's Motion to Compel by Lorenzo J. Palomares Starbuck. (Navarro, Luis)
March 9, 2018 Filing 3 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua D. Greenberg. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10471193 by Ankur Roy. Responses due by 3/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cone, Timothy)
March 8, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Ch. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton. (rms1)
March 8, 2018 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District EMERGENCY MOTION OF ANKUR ROY TO COMPEL HIS FORMER ATTORNEY TO COMPLY WITH A SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS WITHIN 24 HOURS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Filing fee $47.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-10470377, payment transferred from : 1:18-mc-20897, filed by Ankur Roy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)(Cone, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ankur Roy
Represented By: Timothy Cone
Represented By: Joshua D. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo J. Palomares Starbuck
Represented By: Luis Frank Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?