Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Soto
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC and Dish Network L.L.C.
Defendant: Jose Soto
Case Number: 1:2019cv20090
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice #5 . Upon review of the notice and the record, the Court ORDERS AND ADJUDGES that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All deadlines and hearings are CANCELED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/11/2019. (jws)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC (Boatman, James)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jose Soto. (ar2)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Soto. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11293827, filed by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Boatman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?