Hernandez et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Jessica Fernandez and Dayami Hernandez
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv20139
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Marcia G. Cooke for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 01/30/2019. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3 Order to Show Cause by Dayami Hernandez, Jessica Fernandez. (Sharp, Richard)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/8/2019, Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11301112, filed by Dayami Hernandez, Jessica Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Fernandez
Represented By: Richard Bodin Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayami Hernandez
Represented By: Richard Bodin Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?