Teman v. Perry et al

Plaintiff: Ari Baruch Teman
Defendant: Sandip Buch, New York State Supreme Court, Judge W. Franc Perry and Adam E. Engel
Case Number: 1:2019cv20143
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elias Ronnie Hilal on behalf of New York State Supreme Court. Attorney Elias Ronnie Hilal added to party New York State Supreme Court(pty:dft). (Hilal, Elias)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #23 Response/Reply (Other) filed by Ari Baruch Teman. Document(s) missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (ebz)
February 27, 2019 Filing 23 Answer to Defendant New York State Unified Court System's #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to retain counsel by Ari Baruch Teman. (ebz)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Defendant New York State Unified Court System's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until April 30, 2019 to respond/answer plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/27/2019. (mmc)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Answer due 4/30/2019. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Ari Baruch Teman. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/27/2019. (mmc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Mindy M. Jeng, mailing date February 27, 2019, (cco)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by W. Franc Perry. (Hilal, Elias)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elias Ronnie Hilal on behalf of W. Franc Perry. Attorney Elias Ronnie Hilal added to party W. Franc Perry(pty:dft). (Hilal, Elias)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to retain counsel by New York State Unified Court System. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (ebz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #1 Certificate of service) (ebz).
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Motion to dismiss action against Defendants re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ari Baruch Teman. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (ebz)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Sandip Buch served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (ebz)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Adam E. Engel served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (ebz)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Judge W. Franc Perry served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (ebz)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 New York State Supreme Court of New York State c/o NY State Attorney General served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (ebz)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to NY State c/o NY State Attorney General. (ebz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Sandip Buch, Adam E. Engel. Responses due by 2/22/2019 (Gitkin, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Paul Gitkin on behalf of Sandip Buch, Adam E. Engel. Attorney James Paul Gitkin added to party Sandip Buch (pty:dft), Attorney James Paul Gitkin added to party Adam E. Engel(pty:dft). (Gitkin, James)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (koa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 1/10/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100179357 (ail)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Ari Baruch Teman. (ail)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sandip Buch, Adam E. Engel, New York State Supreme Court, W. Franc Perry. (ail)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ari Baruch Teman, Sandip Buch, Adam E. Engel, New York State Supreme Court. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Ari Baruch Teman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teman v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandip Buch
Represented By: James Paul Gitkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Supreme Court
Represented By: Elias Ronnie Hilal
Represented By: Mindy M. Jeng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge W. Franc Perry
Represented By: Elias Ronnie Hilal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam E. Engel
Represented By: James Paul Gitkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ari Baruch Teman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?