Rubin v. The City of Miami Beach et al

Plaintiff: Sidney G. Rubin
Defendant: Robert I. Barrar, Michael Auch, Bennet Brummer, Miami-Dade County State Attorney Office, The City of Miami Beach Police Department, William Young, The City of Miami Beach, Unknown, Janet Reno, Six unknown City of Miami Beach Police Officers and Kenneth Behle
Case Number: 1:2019cv20520
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 Amended Complaint, by Sidney G. Rubin. (jas)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Auch, Robert I. Barrar, Kenneth Behle, Bennet Brummer, Janet Reno, Six unknown City of Miami Beach Police Officers, William Young filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Sidney G. Rubin.(jas)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Plaintiff is to follow the instructions in the March 13, 2019 Order [ECF No. 9] entered separately. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff, Sidney G. Rubin has until March 25, 2019 to file an amended complaint, failing which the case will be dismissed. Upon receipt of the amended complaint, the Court will direct the Clerk to re-open the case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Belated Response to #5 by Sidney G. Rubin. (See image DE #7 ) (vmz)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Sidney G. Rubin. Responses due by 3/27/2019 (vmz)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is INSTRUCTED to CLOSE the case, and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Complaint [ECF No. 1] is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff has until February 25, 2019, to file an amended complaint, addressing the numerous deficiencies outlined above, failing which the case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Auch, Robert I. Barrar, Kenneth Behle, Bennet Brummer, Miami-Dade County State Attorney Office, Janet Reno, Six unknown City of Miami Beach Police Officers, The City of Miami Beach, The City of Miami Beach Police Department, William Young. (kpe) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/8/2019) (kpe).
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 2/8/2019 in the amount of $ 400, receipt number FLS100181149 (kpe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Auch, Robert I. Barrar, Kenneth Behle, Bennet Brummer, Miami-Dade County State Attorney Office, Janet Reno, Six unknown City of Miami Beach Police Officers, The City of Miami Beach, The City of Miami Beach Police Department, Unknown, William Young, filed by Sidney Rubin. Filing fees $ 400.00. NOT PAID/NO IFP FILED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubin v. The City of Miami Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert I. Barrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Auch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennet Brummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Dade County State Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Miami Beach Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Miami Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six unknown City of Miami Beach Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Behle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?