Valdes v. Allied Building Products LLC

Plaintiff: Mirta Valdes
Defendant: Allied Building Products LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv20542
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
1 Judge: Darrin P Gayles
2 Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 4/8/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 3/11/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.). Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Mirta Valdes (Saavedra, Nathaly)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Allied Building Products LLC (Gay, Christine)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge for Trial. Filed by Allied Building Products LLC (Gay, Christine)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Consent Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Allied Building Products LLC (Gay, Christine)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Building Products LLC (Gay, Christine)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before March 5, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (lfn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga recused. Case reassigned to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (jc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C.1446 by Allied Building Products LLC (Gay, Christine)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11383583, filed by Allied Building Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gay, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdes v. Allied Building Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirta Valdes
Represented By: Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd
Represented By: Nathaly Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Building Products LLC
Represented By: David Newman
Represented By: Christine Fuqua Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?