Fouad v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: Omar Mohsen Ibrahim Fouad
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv20676
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Omar Mohsen Ibrahim Fouad (ls)[System Updated]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #8 ; denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Obtain Investigative Information #9 ; denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion Denying First Offer, and Requesting Second Offer #12 ; denying as moot Defendant's Motion For a Ruling on Chase's Pending Motion to Dismiss Complaint and to File Unilateral Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order #13 . Closing Case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (jm01)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION (i) For a Ruling on Chase's Pending Motion to Dismiss Complaint, and (ii) to File Unilateral Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chase's Proposed Scheduling Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chase's Proposed Scheduling Order)(Lechich, Brian)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Denying First Offer, and Requesting Second Offer by Omar Mohsen Ibrahim Fouad. (ls)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Pretrial Order #10 . Therein, Defendant informs the Court that Defendant has made efforts to hold and facilitate a scheduling conference with Plaintiff, and that prior to the conference the Parties came to a settlement agreement in principle. Defendant further informs the Court that Plaintiff then sought to reopen settlement negotiations and demanded additional terms. Defendant requests an extension of time to file a joint scheduling report so that it may continue discussions with Plaintiff regarding settlement and/or holding a scheduling conference as required. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #10 is GRANTED. The Parties shall conduct a scheduling conference and file a joint scheduling report on or before April 15, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/26/2019. (ah03)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Pretrial Order re 4 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 4/8/2019 (Lechich, Brian)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Permission to Properly Obtain Investigative Information by Omar Mohsen Ibrahim Fouad. (ls)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 3/14/2019 (Lechich, Brian)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Lechich, Brian)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance with February 22, 2019 Pretrial Order Service Requirement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. re 4 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lechich, Brian)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE BECERRA. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/22/2019. (ah03)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one-inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuits Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/22/2019. (ah03)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11412344, filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lechich, Brian) No Answer / Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 2/21/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fouad v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Mohsen Ibrahim Fouad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?