Adan v. Bermudez et al

Plaintiff: Juan Adan, Jr.
Defendant: One17, LLC, Benjamin Bermudez and Ben Bermudes
Case Number: 1:2019cv20825
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Juan Adan, Jr. Replies due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Appraiser Information, #2 Exhibit B - One17, LLC. Fla. Dept. Corp. Information, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Process Server Jorge L. Solis)(Pollack, Bretton)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Benjamin Bermudez, One17, LLC. (Kamilar, Mark)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Alan Kamilar on behalf of Benjamin Bermudez, One17, LLC. Attorney Mark Alan Kamilar added to party Benjamin Bermudez(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Kamilar added to party One17, LLC(pty:dft). (Kamilar, Mark)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Juan Adan, Jr. One17, LLC served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Pollack, Bretton)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Juan Adan, Jr. Benjamin Bermudez served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Pollack, Bretton)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. #6 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #6 is GRANTED. BryanBrunson may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to bcbrunson@bryanbrunsonlaw.com. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/18/2019. (eso)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bryan Brunson, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11480229 by Juan Adan, Jr. Responses due by 3/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Bretton)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE BECERRA. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/5/2019. (osk)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuits Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/5/2019. (osk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jao)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11439537, filed by Juan Adan, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Pollack, Bretton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adan v. Bermudez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One17, LLC
Represented By: Mark Alan Kamilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Bermudez
Represented By: Mark Alan Kamilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Bermudes
Represented By: Mark Alan Kamilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Adan, Jr.
Represented By: Bretton I. Pollack
Represented By: Gary William Pollack
Represented By: Bryan Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?