Morrison et al v. Air Parts & Supply, Co. et al
Plaintiff: Roy E Morrison and Connie L Gladhill
Defendant: The Boeing Company, Air Parts & Supply, Co., Honey International, Inc., f/k/a Allied Signal, as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation, as successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Adel Wiggins, Adel Fasteners and Wiggins Connectors, Textron Aviation, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Cessna Aircraft Company and McCauley Aircraft Products, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, successor by merger to Eaton Aeroquip Inc., f/k/a Aeroquip Corporation, The Boeing Company as successor-in-interest to McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, as successor-in-interest to Pneumo Abex Corporation, Borg Warner Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Stratoflex, Cleveland Wheels and Brakes, and McCauley Aircraft Products, Goodrich Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to B.F. Goodrich Aerospace, The B.F. Goodrich Company, and Rohr Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Dana Companies, LLC f/k/a Dana Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc.,, General Electric Company, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Textron Aviation, Inc, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC and Honeywell International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv20837
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
April 25, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Christopher J. M. Collings added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft). (Collings, Christopher)
April 16, 2019 Filing 82 Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Dana Companies, LLC (Alley, Todd)
April 13, 2019 Filing 81 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Pneumo Abex, LLC. (Sturge, Clarke)
April 12, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added The Boeing Company, Michael P Essignton. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
April 10, 2019 Filing 79 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Textron Aviation, Inc. (Coxhead, Stephen)
April 10, 2019 Filing 78 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by The Boeing Company, The Boeing Company. Attorney Rebecca Carrie Kibbe added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft). (Kibbe, Rebecca)
April 10, 2019 Filing 77 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Upshaw, Anthony)
April 9, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Dana Companies, LLC. (Alley, Todd)
April 8, 2019 Filing 75 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 8, 2019 Filing 74 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand DEFENDANT EATON AEROQUIP LLC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 73 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex, LLC (Sturge, Clarke)
April 4, 2019 Filing 72 Summons Issued as to General Electric Company. (pes)
April 4, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 4, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries, Inc.,. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 4, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Goodrich Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 4, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Borg Warner Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for the two week trial period beginning March 30, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. A place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties shall be established. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party or representatives of each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/29/2019. (eso)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN MIAMI. This case is now set for trial commencing the two week trial period of March 30, 2020, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 13-1, (thirteenth floor) United States Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on March 26, 2020, at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for March 17, 2020, at 11 a.m. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be completed one hundred thirty (130) days prior to the date of trial. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. THE FILING BY COUNSEL OF A NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE IS NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE LOCAL RULES AND SHALL NOT BE PRESUMED TO ALTER OR MODIFY THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/29/2019. (eso)
March 28, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Striking #63 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by The Boeing Company by The Boeing Company. Attorney Danielle Tamara Gauer added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft). (Gauer, Danielle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 64 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gauer, Danielle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 63 STRICKEN PER DE #65 .. Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by The Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gauer, Danielle) Modified on 3/29/2019 (lbc).
March 28, 2019 Filing 62 STIPULATION for Order Extending Deadline for Parties to Serve Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(1)(A) by The Boeing Company (Gauer, Danielle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 61 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #58 Amended Complaint into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): General Electric Company. (Saade, Gabriel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 60 Clerks Notice to Filer re #58 Amended Complaint. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties/mediator. (cbr)
March 27, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Connie L Gladhill, Roy E Morrison (Saade, Gabriel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 58 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Connie L Gladhill, Roy E Morrison.(Saade, Gabriel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies, LLC (Alley, Todd)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend the Amended Complaint. #54 . Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) permits a party to amend its pleadings by leave of court or by written consent of the adverse party. The decision to grant or deny a motion to amend pleadings is within the sound discretion of the trial court. Dussouy v. Gulf Coast Inv. Corp., 660 F.2d 594, 598 (5th Cir. 1981). The policy of the federal rules is to permit liberal amendment to facilitate determination of claims on the merits and to prevent litigation from becoming a technical exercise in the fine points of pleading. Id. Thus, unless there is a substantial reason to deny leave to amend, the discretion of the district court is not broad enough to permit denial. Id. A substantial reason could include "undue delay, bad faith or dilatory motive, repeated failure to cure deficiencies by amendments previously allowed, undue prejudice to the opposing party, and futility of the amendment." Grayson v. Kmart Corp., 79 F.3d 1086, 1110 (11th Cir. 1996). Here, Defendants consent to Plaintiffs' filing of a Second Amended Complaint. #54 at 4. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Amended Complaint #54 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is instructed to file its Second Amended Complaint on the docket on or before March 29, 2019. It is further ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in light of the filing of a Second Amended Complaint #54 , the Motion to Dismiss #40 is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/25/2019. (eso)
March 25, 2019 Filing 55 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Borg Warner Corporation (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 22, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Amended Complaint by Connie L Gladhill, Roy E Morrison. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(Saade, Gabriel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc., (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 22, 2019 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc. (Iovino, Caroline)
March 21, 2019 Filing 51 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Textron Aviation, Inc (Coxhead, Stephen)
March 19, 2019 Filing 50 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Melaragno, Peter)
March 19, 2019 Filing 49 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC. (Melaragno, Peter)
March 19, 2019 Filing 48 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 19, 2019 Filing 47 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Goodrich Corporation (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 18, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Melaragno, Peter)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Air Parts & Supply Co. #42 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Stipulation, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the above-styled cause is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Air Parts & Supply Co. only. The Clerk of Court is instructed to TERMINATE Defendant Air Parts & Supply Co. as a party to this case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/18/2019. (eso)
March 18, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , Notice of Adoption by Pneumo Abex, LLC. (Sturge, Clarke)
March 18, 2019 Filing 43 Notice of Joinder in Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss, ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Upshaw, Anthony)
March 15, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Notice of Dropping Party as to Defendant, Air Parts & Supply Co. Only by Air Parts & Supply, Co. (Holt, Michael)
March 14, 2019 Filing 41 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by The Boeing Company (Kibbe, Rebecca)
March 14, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION TO DISMISS #10 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 3/28/2019) by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joe Herron in Support of Defendant The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting The Boeing Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint)(Kibbe, Rebecca)
March 13, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy John Ferguson on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Attorney Timothy John Ferguson added to party The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(pty:dft). (Ferguson, Timothy)
March 13, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
March 12, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dana Companies, LLC. (Alley, Todd)
March 12, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle Tamara Gauer on behalf of The Boeing Company. Attorney Danielle Tamara Gauer added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft). (Gauer, Danielle)
March 12, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward)
March 11, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Fraser Coxhead on behalf of Textron Aviation, Inc. Attorney Stephen Fraser Coxhead added to party Textron Aviation, Inc(pty:dft). (Coxhead, Stephen)
March 11, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clarke Scott Sturge on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC. Attorney Clarke Scott Sturge added to party Pneumo Abex, LLC(pty:dft). (Sturge, Clarke)
March 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Salas on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC. Attorney Henry Salas added to party Pneumo Abex, LLC(pty:dft). (Salas, Henry)
March 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evelyn Fletcher Davis on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC. Attorney Evelyn Fletcher Davis added to party Dana Companies, LLC(pty:dft). (Davis, Evelyn)
March 8, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Carlton Alley on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC. Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Dana Companies, LLC(pty:dft). (Alley, Todd)
March 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caroline Marie Iovino on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. Attorney Caroline Marie Iovino added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft). (Iovino, Caroline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Nolan Upshaw on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. Attorney Anthony Nolan Upshaw added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft). (Upshaw, Anthony)
March 7, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Borg Warner Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Goodrich Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc.,. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 7, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Jane Cole on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft). (Cole, Susan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Jane Cole on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.,. Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party IMO Industries, Inc.,(pty:dft). (Cole, Susan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Jane Cole on behalf of Goodrich Corporation. Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:dft). (Cole, Susan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Jane Cole on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation. Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Borg Warner Corporation(pty:dft). (Cole, Susan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.,. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party IMO Industries, Inc.,(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of Goodrich Corporation. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Borg Warner Corporation(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.,. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party IMO Industries, Inc.,(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Goodrich Corporation. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Borg Warner Corporation(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC. re #10 Amended Complaint NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT EATON AEROQUIP LLC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AS FILED IN STATE COURT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Melaragno, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by Roy E Morrison.(Saade, Gabriel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucia V. Pazos on behalf of The Boeing Company. Attorney Lucia V. Pazos added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft). (Pazos, Lucia)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Air Parts & Supply, Co.. (Holt, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Roland Holt on behalf of Air Parts & Supply, Co.. Attorney Michael Roland Holt added to party Air Parts & Supply, Co.(pty:dft). (Holt, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Stephen Smith, III on behalf of Air Parts & Supply, Co.. Attorney M. Stephen Smith, III added to party Air Parts & Supply, Co.(pty:dft). (Smith, M.)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE BECERRA. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/5/2019. (osk)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one-inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuits Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/5/2019. (osk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11442926, filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court File)(Kibbe, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison et al v. Air Parts & Supply, Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Rebecca Carrie Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia V. Pazos
Represented By: Danielle Tamara Gauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Parts & Supply, Co.
Represented By: Michael Roland Holt
Represented By: M. Stephen Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honey International, Inc., f/k/a Allied Signal, as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation, as successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Adel Wiggins, Adel Fasteners and Wiggins Connectors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Cessna Aircraft Company and McCauley Aircraft Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, successor by merger to Eaton Aeroquip Inc., f/k/a Aeroquip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company as successor-in-interest to McDonnell Douglas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex, LLC, as successor-in-interest to Pneumo Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Stratoflex, Cleveland Wheels and Brakes, and McCauley Aircraft Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to B.F. Goodrich Aerospace, The B.F. Goodrich Company, and Rohr Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Timothy John Ferguson
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC f/k/a Dana Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.,
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex, LLC
Represented By: Henry Salas
Represented By: Clarke Scott Sturge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation, Inc
Represented By: Stephen Fraser Coxhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Susan Jane Cole
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Nolan Upshaw
Represented By: Caroline Marie Iovino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy E Morrison
Represented By: Gabriel Santiago Saade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie L Gladhill
Represented By: Gabriel Santiago Saade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?