Ifergane v. Fratellini

Plaintiff: ADRIANA IFERGANE
Defendant: PASCAL FRATELLINI and Scott Holland
Case Number: 1:2019cv21123
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Scott Holland. Attorney Sean R. Santini added to party Scott Holland(pty:dft). (Santini, Sean)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: ( Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 2/11/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), ( Mediation Deadline 10/24/2019.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Pascal Fratellini (Stack, Brian)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Pascal Fratellini. (Stack, Brian)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Joseph Stack on behalf of Pascal Fratellini. Attorney Brian Joseph Stack added to party Pascal Fratellini(pty:dft). (Stack, Brian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Scott Holland. (jas)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants 12 counsel's motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Joseph S. Fogel of the law firm of Adept Law Firm, is given permission to appear and participate in this matter, as co-counsel, on behalf of Plaintiff Adriana Ifergane. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/8/2019. (kbe)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph Fogel. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11535341 by Adriana Ifergane. Responses due by 4/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lazarovic, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Adriana Ifergane re #9 Amended Complaint filed by Adriana Ifergane (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Lazarovic, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Adriana Ifergane.(Lazarovic, David)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Amended Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Adriana Ifergane, as to #1 Complaint,. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/5/2019.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies, albeit without prejudice, #5 counsel's motion for Joseph S. Fogel to appear pro hac vice. Contrary to the requirements of Local Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys, local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (A sample motion reciting the proper language may be found on the Court's website.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/28/2019. (kbe)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph Fogel. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11504953 by Adriana Ifergane. Responses due by 4/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Lazarovic, David)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added ("Does 1-5 Inclusive"). The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jc)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pascal Fratellini. (jc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PASCAL FRATELLINI. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11498342, payment transferred from :19cv21120 - IFERGANE v. FRATELLINI, filed by ADRIANA IFERGANE. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lazarovic, David) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ifergane v. Fratellini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASCAL FRATELLINI
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Holland
Represented By: Sean R. Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIANA IFERGANE
Represented By: David J Lazarovic
Represented By: Joseph S. Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?