Jones v. Silva et al
Plaintiff: Jessie Jones and Jessie Wimsy Jones
Defendant: Joann Lamarca, Deborah Smith, Jose J. Silva, Steven Perez and Kaleena Ware
Case Number: 1:2019cv21133
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA for want of prosecution because the Appellant Jessie Wimsy Jones failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules re #7 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jessie Wimsy Jones. USCA #19-12035-A. (apz)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Jessie Wimsy Jones re #7 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (apz)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by Jessie Wimsy Jones. (apz)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #7 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jessie Wimsy Jones. Date received by USCA: 5/23/2019. USCA Case Number: 19-12035-A. (apz)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/28/2019. (br)
May 23, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appeal as to #6 Order on Report and Recommendations by Jessie Wimsy Jones. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (apz)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 Report and Recommendations. This action is DISMISSED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Motions terminated: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jessie Wimsy Jones, #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Jessie Wimsy Jones Recommending that: 1. this complaint be DISMISSED for f, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jessie Wimsy Jones. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Jessie Wimsy Jones; Recommending that: 1. this complaint be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 1915(e) and as frivolous, Carroll v. Gross, et al., 984 F.2d 392, 393 (11th Cir. 1993); 2. the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (DE#3 ) denied; and 3. the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jessie Jones. (ail)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ail)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Joann Lamarca, Jose J. Silva, Deborah Smith, Kaleena Ware. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Jessie Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Silva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Lamarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose J. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleena Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Wimsy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?