Leitman v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Lorn Leitman
Defendant: Warden, FCI Miami and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv21139
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald L Graham
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS to #4 Report and Recommendations by Lorn Leitman. (lbc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE 28 U.S.C. 2241-FIRST STEP ACT on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lorn Leitman; Recommending that this petition be DISMISSED without prejudice, and the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 5/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00, No IFP/Not Paid, filed by Lorn Leitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jas) (jas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitman v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, FCI Miami
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorn Leitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?