MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and MSP Recovery Claims, Series, LLC
Defendant: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv21194
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #6 Transmittal Letter Sent, #5 Order Remanding Case to State Court, (drz)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit, Dade County, FL. State Court Case Number: 19-002532-CA-25. (caw)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the Eleventh Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 4/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Symons, Robin)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11514963, filed by MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - complaint, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Symons, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Represented By: Jacqueline Marissa De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?